Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB264 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 14RS-131	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
SENATE BILL NO. 264
BY SENATOR MARTINY 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Department of Economic Development. (6/30/14)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(7)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(i), relative to the Department of2
Economic Development; to provide for the re-creation of the Department of3
Economic Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department by4
law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the5
existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Economic Development and8
the statutory entities made a part of the Department of Economic Development by law shall9
be re-created effective June 30, 2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in10
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised11
Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2. Notwithstanding any provision of any previous Act of the legislature, all13
statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Economic Development and the14
statutory entities made a part of the Department of Economic Development, as re-created15
under the provisions of Section 1 of this Act, shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S.16
49:191. However, the Department of Economic Development and the statutory entities17 SB NO. 264
SLS 14RS-131	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
made a part of the Department of Economic Development may be re-created prior to such1
date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana2
Revised Statutes of 1950.3
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent those4
provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.5
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(7)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows:6
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-7
out period for statutory entities; table of dates8
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the9
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their10
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority11
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of12
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:13
*          *          *14
(7)  July 1, 2018:15
(a) The Department of Economic Development and all statutory the16
entities made a part of the department by law.17
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(5)(i) is hereby repealed in its entirety.18
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the19
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on20
June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.21
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Michelle Ducharme.
DIGEST
Martiny (SB 264)
Present law provides that the Department of Economic Development (department) and all
the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their
operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as
of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the department and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provision of
the "sunset" law that sets out the procedure for review and re-creation and that requires a SB NO. 264
SLS 14RS-131	ORIGINAL
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional
provisions. July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1,
2018, unless the department is re-created. 
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(i))