The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Michelle Ducharme. DIGEST Martiny (SB 287) Present law provides that the Department of Public Service (department) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the department and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provision of the "sunset" law that sets out the procedure for review and re-creation and that requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(b))