SLS 14RS-132 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2014 SENATE BILL NO. 288 BY SENATOR MARTINY SUNSET LAW. Re-creates entities transferred to or placed within the office of the governor. (6/30/14) AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 49:191(7)(a) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(l), relative to certain agencies2 within the office of the governor, including provisions to provide for the re-creation3 of such agencies; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory4 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related5 matters.6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the agencies transferred to the office of the8 governor pursuant to R.S. 36:4.1, to wit: the Louisiana State Board of Cosmetology, the9 Office of Financial Institutions, the Louisiana State Racing Commission, the Louisiana10 Cemetery Board, the State Board of Certified Public Accountants of Louisiana, the State11 Board of Architectural Examiners, the Louisiana Real Estate Commission, the Louisiana12 State Board of Home Inspectors, the State Licensing Board for Contractors, the Board of13 Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters, the Louisiana Auctioneers Licensing Board,14 the State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers, the Louisiana Real Estate Appraisers15 Board, the State Boxing and Wrestling Commission, the Louisiana Motor Vehicle16 Commission, the Louisiana Used Motor Vehicle Commission, and the Louisiana State17 SB NO. 288 SLS 14RS-132 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Polygraph Board shall be re-created effective June 30, 2014, and all statutory authority1 therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 492 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.3 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the aforementioned agencies4 and the statutory entities made a part of them as re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall5 cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the aforementioned agencies6 may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter7 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.8 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that9 those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.10 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(7)(a) is hereby enacted to read as follows:11 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-12 out period for statutory entities; table of dates13 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the14 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their15 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority16 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of17 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:18 * * *19 (7) July 1, 2018:20 (a) Those entities transferred to or placed within the office of the21 governor pursuant to R.S. 36:4.1.22 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(5)(l) is hereby repealed in its entirety.23 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the24 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on25 June 30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.26 SB NO. 288 SLS 14RS-132 ORIGINAL Page 3 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Ashley Menou. DIGEST Martiny (SB 288) Present law requires, under the "sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014: (1)La. State Board of Cosmetology. (2)Office of Financial Institutions. (3)La. State Racing Commission. (4)La. Cemetery Board. (5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La. (6)State Board of Architectural Examiners. (7)La. Real Estate Commission. (8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors. (9)State Licensing Board for Contractors. (10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters. (11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board. (12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers. (13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board. (14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission. (15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission. (16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission. (17)La. State Polygraph Board. Present law provides that all legislative authority for such entities will cease as of July 1, 2015, unless legislation is enacted which authorizes the re-creation of those entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which sets out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination will begin July 1, 2018, unless the agency is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(l))