The original instrument was prepared by Ashley Menou. The following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Linda Nugent. DIGEST Present law requires, under the "sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014: (1)La. Board of Cosmetology. (2)Office of Financial Institutions. (3)La. State Racing Commission. (4)La. Cemetery Board. (5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La. (6)State Board of Architectural Examiners. (7)La. Real Estate Commission. (8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors. (9)State Licensing Board for Contractors. (10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters. (11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board. (12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers. (13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board. (14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission. (15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission. (16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission. (17)La. State Polygraph Board. Present law provides that all legislative authority for such entities will cease as of July 1, 2015, unless legislation is enacted which authorizes the re-creation of those entities prior thereto. Proposed law provides for re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which sets out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, is the new termination date, and termination will begin July 1, 2018, unless the agency is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(l))