Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB288 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Martiny (SB 288)	Act No. 123
Prior law required, under the "sunset" law, that the following agencies shall begin to
terminate their operations on July 1, 2014: 
(1)La. Board of Cosmetology.
(2)Office of Financial Institutions.
(3)La. State Racing Commission.
(4)La. Cemetery Board.
(5)State Board of Certified Public Accountants of La.
(6)State Board of Architectural Examiners.
(7)La. Real Estate Commission.
(8)La. State Board of Home Inspectors.
(9)State Licensing Board for Contractors.
(10)Board of Examiners of Certified Shorthand Reporters.
(11)La. Auctioneers Licensing Board. 
(12)State Board of Examiners of Interior Designers. 
(13)La. Real Estate Appraisers Board.
(14)State Boxing and Wrestling Commission.
(15)La. Motor Vehicle Commission.
(16)La. Used Motor Vehicle Commission.
(17)La. State Polygraph Board.
Prior law provided that all legislative authority for such entities will cease as of July 1, 2015,
unless legislation is enacted which authorizes the re-creation of those entities prior thereto.
New law provides for re-creation of those agencies, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance
with the "sunset" law.  Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law which sets out the
procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to re-create each
statutory entity within those agencies along with additional provisions. July 1, 2019, is the
new termination date, and termination will begin July 1, 2018, unless the agency is again re-
created.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7)(a); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(l))