Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB445 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Carla S. Roberts. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by
Julie J. Baxter.
DIGEST
Crowe (SB 445)
Present law provides for the creation of a new section of court and judgeship to be designated as
Section "D" of the Orleans Parish Juvenile Court and authorizes the judge to appoint a crier and
stenographer for the section.
Proposed law abolishes Section "D" of the Orleans Parish Juvenile Court effective Dec. 31, 2014,
at midnight.
Proposed law requires the first judgeship that becomes vacant by death, resignation, retirement,
or removal during the term of office on or after Dec. 31, 2014, at midnight to be abolished the
following day.
Proposed law requires the allocation of any funding from the city of New Orleans for judgeships
to be allocated for juvenile services within the city of New Orleans upon the abolishment of
those judgeships provided for in proposed law.
Present law provides for the designation of Sections "A" and "D" of the Orleans Parish Juvenile
Court as the special divisions of court with exclusive jurisdiction over child in need of care
proceedings.
Proposed law retains present law except that it removes Section "D" as special divisions of court
with exclusive jurisdiction over child in need of care proceedings, effective Dec. 31, 2015, at
midnight and further provides for all cases allotted to Section "D" to be reallotted equally by the
clerk of court to the remaining sections of court.
Present law provides for the designation of Sections "B", "C", "E", and "F" as the special
divisions of court with exclusive jurisdiction over delinquency proceedings.
Proposed law retains present law until such time as one of the sections of court becomes vacant
due to death, resignation, retirement, or removal on or after Dec. 31, 2014, at which time, all
cases of the abolished section will be reallotted equally by the clerk of court among the
remaining sections of the court.
Present law provides for the creation of a new section of the court, in addition to the existing
sections and one new judgeship who shall preside over the new section to be designated as
Section "F".  Further authorizes the judge to appoint a crier and stenographer for his section of
court to perform the same duties and receive the same compensation as similar officials in other
sections of court. Proposed law retains present law except that it removes Section "D" as an existing section of the
court.
Effective Dec. 31, 2014, at midnight as to the reduction of court division.
Effective August 1, 2014 as to the remainder of the Act.
(Amends R.S. 13:1568.3, 1595, and 1595.1)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary A to the engrossed
bill
1. Changes the date by which the judgeship created for Section "D" of the Juvenile
Court for the parish of Orleans shall be abolished from December 31, 2015, at
midnight to December 31, 2014, at midnight.
2. Changes from December 31, 2015, to December 31, 2014, the date on which, as
of midnight, the first judgeship becoming vacant by death, resignation or
retirement, or removal shall be abolished the following day.
3. Changes the effective date of Section 2 of the Act from December 31, 2015, to
December 31, 2014.
4. Changes from December 31, 2015, to December 31, 2014, the date at which, at
midnight, all cases allotted to Section "D" of the Juvenile Court for the parish of
Orleans shall be reallotted equally by the clerk of court among Sections "A", "B",
"C", "E", and "F" on January 1, 2015.