Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB510 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 14RS-150	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
SENATE BILL NO. 510
BY SENATOR HEITMEIER 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Department of Veterans Affairs. (6/30/14)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(7) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(j), relative to the Department of2
Veterans Affairs; to provide for re-creation of the Department of Veterans Affairs3
and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to provide for the4
effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence of such5
statutory entities; to provide for an effective date; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Veterans Affairs and the8
statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,9
2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of10
Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 11
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Veterans12
Affairs and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section 113
of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department14
of Veterans Affairs may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions15
of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.16
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that17 SB NO. 510
SLS 14RS-150	ENGROSSED
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.1
Section 4. R.S. 49:191(7) is hereby enacted to read as follows:2
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-3
out period for statutory entities; table of dates4
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the5
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their6
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority7
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of8
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:9
*          *          *10
(7) July 1, 2018:11
The Department of Veterans Affairs and all statutory entities made a12
part of the department by law.13
Section 5. R.S. 49:191(5)(j) is hereby repealed in its entirety.14
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the15
governor subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on June16
30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.17
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Christopher D. Adams.
DIGEST
Heitmeier (SB 510)
Present law provides that the Department of Veterans Affairs and all statutory entities made
a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and
that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of Veterans Affairs and
its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, for a four-year period, in accordance with the
"sunset" law. Supersedes that provision of the "sunset" law that requires a separate bill to
recreate each statutory entity within the department.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(j))