Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB511 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 14RS-149	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2014
SENATE BILL NO. 511
BY SENATOR HEITMEIER 
SUNSET LAW.  Re-creates the Department of Children and Family Services. (6/30/14)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(7) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(5)(g), relative to the Department of2
Children and Family Services; to provide for re-creation of the Department of3
Children and Family Services and the statutory entities made a part of the department4
by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the5
existence of such statutory entities; to provide for an effective date; and to provide6
for related matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Children and Family Services9
and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective10
June 30, 2014, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the11
provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950. 12
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Children and13
Family Services and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by14
Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2019, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the15
Department of Children and Family Services may be re-created prior to such date in16
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised17 SB NO. 511
SLS 14RS-149	ENGROSSED
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Statutes of 1950.1
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that2
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.3
Section 4. R.S. 49:191(7) is hereby enacted to read as follows:4
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-5
out period for statutory entities; table of dates6
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the7
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their8
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority9
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of10
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:11
*          *          *12
(7) July 1, 2018:13
The Department of Children and Family Services and all statutory14
entities made a part of the department by law.15
Section 5. R.S. 49:191(5)(g) is hereby repealed in its entirety.16
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2014; if vetoed by the17
governor subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on June18
30, 2014, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.19
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Christopher D. Adams.
DIGEST
Heitmeier (SB 511)
Present law provides that the Department of Children and Family Services and all statutory
entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015,
unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its
statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of Children and Family
Services and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, for a four-year period, in
accordance with the "sunset" law.  Supersedes that provision of the "sunset" law which
requires a separate bill to recreate each statutory entity within the department. SB NO. 511
SLS 14RS-149	ENGROSSED
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Effective on June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(g))