Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB674 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Julie J. Baxter. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by
Ann S. Brown.
DIGEST
Nevers (SB 674)
Proposed law provides for a moratorium on municipal incorporations from January 1, 2014,
through December 31, 2015.  Further provides that during this moratorium, no residents of any
unincorporated area may petition for the incorporation of the area as provided in present law.  
Proposed law provides that, if prior to January 1, 2014, the residents of an unincorporated area
initiated a petition for incorporation under present law and no election for the incorporation was
held on or before November 4, 2014, then the petition for incorporation shall be suspended
during this moratorium and may be continued on or after January 1, 2016.  Further provides that
any petition suspended as a result of the moratorium in proposed law shall be subject to the
provisions governing municipal incorporation in effect when the moratorium ends.
Proposed law provides that, if  prior to January 1, 2014, the residents of an unincorporated area
initiated a petition for incorporation under present law and despite complying with all other
requirements and deadlines, an election on the petition is not held on or before November  4,
2014, due to a court order or court action, the petition for incorporation shall not be suspended
during the moratorium and may be continued.  However, no signatures shall be collected for the
petition after July 23, 2014.
Proposed law provides that certain standing committees shall function as a joint committee to
complete a comprehensive review and evaluation of the certain state policies and submit a
written report of its findings and recommendations, including any proposed legislation, to the
legislature no later than December 1, 2014, so that any proposed legislation associated with the
issue may be considered in the 2015 Regular Session of the Legislature.
Proposed law provides that the joint committee shall consider testimony and information from
national and state organizations, including but not limited to the Louisiana Municipal
Association, the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, the Louisiana Assessors' Association, the
Louisiana Sheriffs' Association, the Louisiana Fire Chiefs Association, the Louisiana School
Boards Association, the Louisiana Association of Tax Administrators, the National Association
of Counties, the United States Conference of Mayors, and the National League of Cities.
Proposed law exempts the following parishes:  Bossier, Caddo, East and West Carroll, Claiborne,
Concordia, Lincoln, Madison, Morehouse, Ouachita,  Richland, Tensas and Union from the
provisions of proposed law.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Adds R.S. 33:7.1)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs
to the original bill
1. Changes the election for the incorporation to be held from on or before January 1,
2014, to on or before November 4, 2014. 
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Makes technical changes.
2. Adds a provision that prevents suspension of certain petitions during the
moratorium. Further provides that signatures cannot be collected after 7/23/14. 
3. Adds a provision that excludes certain parishes from proposed law.