Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB88 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument, were prepared by Tracy Sabina Sudduth.
DIGEST
Alario (SB 88)
Present law (sunset law) provides that the Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities
made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014,
and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the
legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities
prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of the Treasury and its
statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the sunset law.  Proposed law
supercedes the provisions of the sunset law that set out the procedures for review and re-creation
and that requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department, along
with additional provisions.  Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date, and
termination would begin on July 1, 2018, unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2014.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(7); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(a))