Alario (SB 88) Act No. 446 Prior law (sunset law) provided that the Department of the Treasury and all statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto. New law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of the Treasury and its statutory entities, effective June 30, 2014, in accordance with the sunset law. New law supercedes the provisions of the sunset law that set out the procedures for review and re- creation and that requires a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity within the department, along with additional provisions. New law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date, and termination would begin on July 1, 2018, unless the department is again re-created. Effective June 30, 2014. (Adds R.S. 49:191(7); repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(a))