Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR89 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 14RS-2935	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2014
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 89
BY SENATOR MORRISH 
SENATE.  Designates May 5, 2014, as Vietnam Veterans Day.
A RESOLUTION1
To designate May 5, 2014, as Vietnam Veterans Day and to commemorate the brave and2
steadfast service by America's Armed Forces during a time of upheaval on the home3
front and change on all sides.4
WHEREAS, the Vietnam War was fought in the Republic of Vietnam from 1961 to5
1975, and involved North Vietnamese regular forces and Viet Cong guerrilla forces in armed6
conflict with United States Armed Forces and the Army of the Republic of Vietnam; and7
WHEREAS, the United States Armed Forces became involved in Vietnam because8
the United States Government wanted to provide direct military support to the government9
of South Vietnam to defend itself against the growing Communist threat from North10
Vietnam; and11
WHEREAS, members of the United States Armed Forces began serving in an12
advisory role to the government of the Republic of Vietnam in 1961; and13
WHEREAS, as a result of the Gulf of Tonkin incidents on August 2 and 4, 1964,14
Congress overwhelmingly passed the Gulf of Tonkin Resolution (Public Law 88-408), on15
August 7, 1964, which provided the authority to the President of the United States to16
prosecute the war against North Vietnam; and17
WHEREAS, in 1965, United States Armed Forces ground combat units arrived in18 SR NO. 89
SLS 14RS-2935	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 3
Vietnam; and1
WHEREAS, by the end of 1965, there were 80,000 United States troops in Vietnam,2
and by 1969, a peak of approximately 543,000 troops was reached; and3
WHEREAS, on January 27, 1973, the Treaty of Paris was signed, which required the4
release of all United States prisoners-of-war held in North Vietnam and the withdrawal of5
all United States Armed Forces from South Vietnam; and6
WHEREAS, on March 30, 1973, the United States Armed Forces completed the7
withdrawal of combat units and combat support units from South Vietnam; and8
WHEREAS, on April 30, 1975, North Vietnamese regular forces captured Saigon,9
the capitol of South Vietnam, effectively placing South Vietnam under Communist control;10
and11
WHEREAS, more than 58,000 members of the United States Armed Forces lost their12
lives in Vietnam and more than 300,000 members of the Armed Forces were wounded,13
including many of Louisiana's finest; and14
WHEREAS, in 1982, the Vietnam Veterans Memorial was dedicated in the District15
of Columbia to commemorate those members of the United States Armed Forces who died16
or were declared missing-in-action in Vietnam; and17
WHEREAS, the Vietnam War was an extremely divisive issue among the people of18
the United States and a conflict that caused a generation of veterans to wait too long for the19
United States public to acknowledge and honor the efforts and services of such veterans; and20
WHEREAS, members of the United States Armed Forces who served bravely and21
faithfully for the United States during the Vietnam War were often wrongly criticized for22
the policy decisions made by four presidential administrations in the United States; and23
WHEREAS, the establishment of a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" would24
be an appropriate way to honor those members of the United States Armed Forces who25
served in South Vietnam and throughout Southeast Asia during the Vietnam War.26
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana:27
A. Honors and recognizes the contributions of veterans, particularly Louisiana28
veterans, who served in the United States Armed Forces in Vietnam during war and during29
peace.30 SR NO. 89
SLS 14RS-2935	ORIGINAL
Page 3 of 3
B. Encourages the state and its local governments to establish "Welcome Home1
Vietnam Veterans Day".2
C. Encourages the people of Louisiana to observe "Welcome Home Vietnam3
Veterans Day" with appropriate ceremonies and activities that:4
(1) Provide the appreciation Vietnam War veterans deserve, but did not receive upon5
returning home from the war.6
(2) Demonstrate the resolve that never again shall the nation and this state disregard7
and denigrate a generation of veterans.8
(3) Promote awareness of the faithful service and contributions of such veterans9
during their military service as well as to their communities since returning home.10
(4) Promote awareness of the importance of entire communities empowering11
veterans and the families of veterans to readjust to civilian life after military service.12
(5) Promote opportunities for such veterans to assist younger veterans returning from13
the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan in rehabilitation from wounds, both seen and unseen, and14
to support the reintegration of younger veterans into civilian life.15
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to16
Governor Bobby Jindal, the Veterans of Foreign Wars, the American Legion, the Louisiana17
Municipal Association, the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, the Louisiana School18
Boards Association, and Alfred Cochran.19
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Heyward Jeffers.
DIGEST
Morrish	SR No. 89
Designates May 5, 2014, as Vietnam Veterans Day.