Louisiana 2014 2014 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR89 Enrolled / Bill

                    Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2014	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 89
BY SENATOR MORRISH 
A RESOLUTION
To designate May 5, 2014, as Vietnam Veterans Day and to commemorate the brave and
steadfast service by America's Armed Forces during a time of upheaval on the home
front and change on all sides.
WHEREAS, the Vietnam War was fought in the Republic of Vietnam from 1961 to
1975, and involved North Vietnamese regular forces and Viet Cong guerrilla forces in armed
conflict with United States Armed Forces and the Army of the Republic of Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, the United States Armed Forces became involved in Vietnam because
the United States Government wanted to provide direct military support to the government
of South Vietnam to defend itself against the growing Communist threat from North
Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, members of the United States Armed Forces began serving in an
advisory role to the government of the Republic of Vietnam in 1961; and
WHEREAS, as a result of the Gulf of Tonkin incidents on August 2 and 4, 1964,
Congress overwhelmingly passed the Gulf of Tonkin Resolution (Public Law 88-408), on
August 7, 1964, which provided the authority to the President of the United States to
prosecute the war against North Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, in 1965, United States Armed Forces ground combat units arrived in
Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, by the end of 1965, there were 80,000 United States troops in Vietnam,
and by 1969, a peak of approximately 543,000 troops was reached; and
WHEREAS, on January 27, 1973, the Treaty of Paris was signed, which required the
release of all United States prisoners-of-war held in North Vietnam and the withdrawal of
all United States Armed Forces from South Vietnam; and SR NO. 89	ENROLLED
Page 2 of 3
WHEREAS, on March 30, 1973, the United States Armed Forces completed the
withdrawal of combat units and combat support units from South Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, on April 30, 1975, North Vietnamese regular forces captured Saigon,
the capitol of South Vietnam, effectively placing South Vietnam under Communist control;
and
WHEREAS, more than 58,000 members of the United States Armed Forces lost their
lives in Vietnam and more than 300,000 members of the Armed Forces were wounded,
including many of Louisiana's finest; and
WHEREAS, in 1982, the Vietnam Veterans Memorial was dedicated in the District
of Columbia to commemorate those members of the United States Armed Forces who died
or were declared missing-in-action in Vietnam; and
WHEREAS, the Vietnam War was an extremely divisive issue among the people of
the United States and a conflict that caused a generation of veterans to wait too long for the
United States public to acknowledge and honor the efforts and services of such veterans; and
WHEREAS, members of the United States Armed Forces who served bravely and
faithfully for the United States during the Vietnam War were often wrongly criticized for
the policy decisions made by four presidential administrations in the United States; and
WHEREAS, the establishment of a "Welcome Home Vietnam Veterans Day" would
be an appropriate way to honor those members of the United States Armed Forces who
served in South Vietnam and throughout Southeast Asia during the Vietnam War.
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana:
A. Honors and recognizes the contributions of veterans, particularly Louisiana
veterans, who served in the United States Armed Forces in Vietnam during war and during
peace.
B. Encourages the state and its local governments to establish "Welcome Home
Vietnam Veterans Day".
C. Encourages the people of Louisiana to observe "Welcome Home Vietnam
Veterans Day" with appropriate ceremonies and activities that:
(1) Provide the appreciation Vietnam War veterans deserve, but did not receive upon
returning home from the war. SR NO. 89	ENROLLED
Page 3 of 3
(2) Demonstrate the resolve that never again shall the nation and this state disregard
and denigrate a generation of veterans.
(3) Promote awareness of the faithful service and contributions of such veterans
during their military service as well as to their communities since returning home.
(4) Promote awareness of the importance of entire communities empowering
veterans and the families of veterans to readjust to civilian life after military service.
(5) Promote opportunities for such veterans to assist younger veterans returning from
the wars in Iraq and Afghanistan in rehabilitation from wounds, both seen and unseen, and
to support the reintegration of younger veterans into civilian life.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Governor Bobby Jindal, the Veterans of Foreign Wars, the American Legion, the Louisiana
Municipal Association, the Police Jury Association of Louisiana, the Louisiana School
Boards Association, and Alfred Cochran.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE