HLS 15RS-555 ORIGINAL 2015 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 216 BY REPRESENTATIVES SEABAUGH, HENRY BURNS, MIKE JOHNSON, AND PATRICK WILLIAMS AND SENATOR BUFFINGTON TAX/HOTEL OCCUPANCY: Provides relative to the hotel occupancy tax that the Shreveport-Bossier Convention and Tourist Bureau is authorized to levy 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 33:4574.1.1(A)(24)(c) and (d), relative to the Shreveport-Bossier 3 Convention and Tourist Bureau; to provide relative to hotel occupancy taxes levied 4 by the bureau; to provide with respect to an additional hotel occupancy tax; to 5 provide relative to the use of tax proceeds; to provide with respect to the duration of 6 the authority for the additional tax; to provide relative to limitations; and to provide 7 for related matters. 8 Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published 9 as provided by Article III, Section 13 of the Constitution of 10 Louisiana. 11Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 12 Section 1. R.S. 33:4574.1.1(A)(24)(c) and (d) are hereby amended and reenacted to 13read as follows: 14 ยง4574.1.1. Occupancy taxes levied by the commissions 15 A. 16 * * * 17 (24) 18 * * * Page 1 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 15RS-555 ORIGINAL HB NO. 216 1 (c)(i) In addition to the provisions of Subparagraphs (a) and (b) of this 2 Paragraph, the Shreveport-Bossier Convention and Tourist Bureau may levy and 3 collect an additional tax upon the occupancy of hotel rooms, motel rooms, and 4 overnight camping facilities within the jurisdiction of the bureau. The additional tax 5 shall be two one and one half percent of the rent or fee charged for such occupancy 6 as follows: 7 (aa) Fifty percent of one cent shall be levied to support the Shreveport- 8 Bossier Sports Commission and the proceeds shall be dedicated and used as provided 9 in Subparagraph (M)(1)(c) of this Section. 10 (bb) Seventy-five Fifty percent of one cent shall be levied to support the 11 Independence Bowl Foundation and the proceeds shall be dedicated and used as 12 provided in Subparagraph (M)(1)(d) of this Section. 13 (cc) Seventy-five Fifty percent of one cent shall be levied to support the Ark- 14 La-Tex Regional Air Service Alliance and the proceeds shall be dedicated and used 15 as provided in Subparagraph (M)(1)(e) of this Section. 16 (ii) The levy of an additional tax pursuant to this Subparagraph shall be 17 subject to approval by a majority of the electors of Caddo and Bossier parishes who 18 vote on a proposition authorizing the levy of the tax. The bureau shall call an 19 election for the purpose of submitting such a proposition to the voters. The election 20 on the question of the levy of the tax shall be held at the an election scheduled to be 21 held in the parishes of Caddo and Bossier on November 4, 2014. The authority to 22 levy the tax shall terminate on June 30, 2039. of the twelfth calendar year after the 23 date of the approval of the taxation election held pursuant to this Item; however, the 24 authority to levy the tax may be renewed if approved by a majority of the electors of 25 Caddo and Bossier parishes who vote on a proposition authorizing such renewal. 26 Any election to authorize the renewal shall be called by the bureau for the purpose 27 of submitting such a proposition to the voters. The election on the question of the 28 renewal shall be held at an election scheduled to be held in the parishes of Caddo and Page 2 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 15RS-555 ORIGINAL HB NO. 216 1 Bossier. If renewed, the term of renewal shall be as provided in the proposition 2 authorizing such renewal, not to exceed twelve years. 3 (iii) Notwithstanding the provisions of Items (i) and (ii) of this 4 Subparagraph, if an entity that receives money pursuant to Subparagraphs (M)(1)(c) 5 through (e) of this Section ceases to exist, the authority to levy a tax to support such 6 entity shall terminate and any proceeds that have not been distributed to such entity 7 the bureau shall continue to levy the tax that supported the entity, subject to voter 8 approval as required by Item (ii) of this Subparagraph, and the proceeds of the tax 9 shall be distributed equally to the other entities provided for in Subparagraphs 10 (M)(1)(c) through (e) of this Section. 11 (d) Taxes levied pursuant to this Paragraph shall not exceed a combined rate 12 of six and one-half percent. 13 * * * 14 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2015; if vetoed by the governor 15and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 162015, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 216 Original 2015 Regular Session Seabaugh Abstract: Provides relative to hotel occupancy taxes levied by the Shreveport-Bossier Convention and Tourist Bureau. Present law provides that the maximum hotel occupancy tax that the Shreveport-Bossier Convention and Tourist Bureau may levy is 4.5%. Present law (Act No. 674 of the 2014 R.S.) authorized the bureau to levy an additional tax that was subject to voter approval at an election to be held on Nov. 4, 2014. The voters did not approve the tax at that election, so present law does not currently authorize this additional tax. Proposed law amends the provisions of present law as contained in Act No. 674 as follows: Present law authorized an additional hotel occupancy tax of 2%. Proposed law authorizes an additional tax of 1.5%. Proposed law reduces the amount of tax proceeds dedicated to the Independence Bowl Foundation and the Ark-La-Tex Regional Air Service Alliance to one-half of one cent each. Retains dedication of one-half of one cent to the Shreveport-Bossier Sports Commission. Page 3 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 15RS-555 ORIGINAL HB NO. 216 Present law required the election to be held on a specific date. Proposed law authorizes the election to be held at any election scheduled to be held in Bossier and Caddo Parishes. Present law provided for termination of the authority to levy the additional tax on June 30, 2039. Proposed law provides for termination on June 30 of the twelfth calendar year after approval of the tax by the voters but authorizes renewal of such authority. Provides that the term of renewal shall be as provided in the proposition authorizing such renewal, not to exceed 12 years. Present law provides that if any entity that receives tax proceeds from the levy of the additional tax ceases to exist, the bureau's authority to levy a tax to support the entity shall terminate and any proceeds that have not been distributed to the entity shall be distributed equally to the remaining entities. Proposed law changes present law such that, if any entity that receives tax proceeds from the levy of the additional tax ceases to exist, the bureau shall continue to levy the tax, and the proceeds shall be distributed equally to the other entities. Effective July 1, 2015. (Amends R.S. 33:4574.1.1(A)(24)(c) and (d)) Page 4 of 4 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.