Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB223 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 223 Engrossed	2015 Regular Session	Hodges
Abstract: Re-creates the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency Preparedness.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Governor's Office of Homeland Security and Emergency
Preparedness (GOHSEP) and all the statutory entities made a part of that department by law shall
begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2014, and that all legislative authority for such entities
shall cease as of July 1, 2015, unless the legislature enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the
department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of GOHSEP and its statutory entities, effective
June 30, 2015, in accordance with the "sunset law".  Proposed law supersedes the provisions of the
"sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill
to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional provisions, including
ratification and authorization of any acts taken by GOHSEP on or after June 30, 2014, through June
30, 2015.
Proposed law makes July 1, 2019, the new termination date and provides that termination will begin
July 1, 2018, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2015.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(8)(m) and (9); Repeals R.S. 49:191(5)(k)and (10))