Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB308 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 15RS-679	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 308
BY REPRESENTATIVE JONES
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
PUBLIC LANDS/STATE:  Provides for the transfer of certain state property in St. Mary
Parish
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact Sections 1 and 2 of Act No. 54 of the 2014 Regular Session of the
3 Legislature, relative to state property; to provide for the transfer of certain state
4 property; to provide for an effective date; and to provide for related matters.
5Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1.  Sections 1 and 2 of Act No. 54 of the 2014 Regular Session of the
7Legislature are hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
8	Section 1.  The commissioner of administration, notwithstanding any other
9 provision of law to the contrary, is hereby authorized and empowered to convey,
10 transfer, assign, lease or deliver any interest, excluding mineral rights, the state may
11 have to all or any portion of the following described parcel of property to Lawrence
12 Toups, Gloria Barbara Toups, Perry Toups, and Erin Toups:
13	Property acquired by the State through that certain tax sale for nonpayment
14	of 1942 taxes assessed in the name of MRS. SIDNEY D. HANSON,
15	recorded on June 26, 1943, in Book 6-I Page 340 Entry No. 70080, described
16	as "Lot Street, Road, Robertson, Smith."  Said property being more fully
17	described as "Lot 11 of the D. C. Roberts Addition to the Town of Berwick,
18	Louisiana".
19	Section 2.  The commissioner of administration is hereby authorized to enter
20 into such agreements, covenants, conditions, and stipulations and to execute such
21 documents as necessary to properly effectuate any conveyance, transfer, assignment,
22 lease or delivery of title, excluding mineral rights, to the property described in
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-679	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 308
1 Section 1 of this Act, and as more specifically described in any such agreements
2 entered into and documents executed by and between the commissioner of
3 administration and Lawrence Toups, Gloria Barbara Toups, Perry Toups, and Erin
4 Toups, in exchange of consideration proportionate to the appraised value of the
5 property.  Any conveyance, transfer, assignment, lease, or delivery of title provided
6 for in this Act shall be subject to and the land burdened with a right of way grant by
7 the commissioner of administration through the State Land Office to the town of
8 Berwick for an all purpose servitude as identified on a survey plat prepared by Terral
9 J. Martin, Jr. Professional Land Surveyor bearing date January 1, 2014, revised,
10 January 15, 2014.  In the event that Lawrence Toups, Gloria Barbara Toups, Perry
11 Toups, and Erin Toups do not acquire the property described in Section 1 of this Act
12 on or before December 31, 2017, the authorization to convey, transfer, assign, lease,
13 or deliver any interest in that property shall terminate and be null and void on that
14 date.
15 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
16signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
17by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If
18vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
19effective on the day following such approval.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 308 Original 2015 Regular Session	Jones
Present law authorizes the transfer or lease of certain state property in St. Mary Parish from
the division of administration to Lawrence Toups, Gloria Toups, Perry Toups, and Erin
Toups subject to a servitude granted to the town of Berwick.  Provides for the reservation
of mineral rights to the state.  The authority granted in present law terminates if the property
is not transferred on or before Dec. 31, 2017.
Proposed law retains present law except changes one of the parties of the transfer from
Gloria Toups to Barbara Toups.
(Amends ยงยง1 and 2 of Act No. 54 of the 2014 R.S.)
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.