Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB510 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 15RS-1100	ENGROSSED
 2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 510
BY REPRESENTATIVES JAMES, COX, GAINES, HALL, HUNTER, JACKSON,
TERRY LANDRY, NORTON, SMITH, AND WOODRUFF
TAX CREDITS:  Accelerates the sunset of the solar energy systems tax credit
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6030(B)(1) and (2)(a) and (c) and to repeal R.S.
3 47:6030(B)(2)(b)(iii), relative to tax credits; to provide with respect to the solar
4 energy systems tax credit; to change the sunset date for the tax credit; to provide for
5 an effective date; and to provide for related matters.
6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1.  R.S. 47:6030(B)(1) and (2)(a) and (c) are hereby amended and reenacted
8to read as follows: 
9 ยง6030.  Solar energy systems tax credit
10	*          *          *
11	B.(1)  The tax credit for the purchase and installation of a system at a
12 Louisiana residence or for a system which is already installed in a newly constructed
13 home located in Louisiana shall be equal to fifty percent of the first twenty-five
14 thousand dollars of the cost of a system that is purchased and installed on or after
15 January 1, 2008, and before January 1, 2018 July 1, 2015. There shall be no tax
16 credits authorized, issued, or granted as provided in this Paragraph for systems
17 installed after December 31, 2017 July 1, 2015.
18	(2)  Leased systems. Tax credits authorized under this Section for the
19 purchase and installation of a system at a Louisiana residence by a third party
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-1100	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 510
1 through a lease with the owner of the residence shall be subject to the following
2 provisions.
3	(a)  The tax credit shall be equal to fifty percent of the first twenty-five
4 thousand dollars of the cost of purchase for a system installed before January 1,
5 2014.  For a system installed on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2018
6 July 1, 2015, the tax credit shall be equal to thirty-eight percent of the first twenty-
7 five thousand dollars of the cost of purchase.
8	*          *          *
9	(c)  There shall be no tax credits authorized, issued, or granted as provided
10 in this Paragraph for systems installed after December 31, 2017 July 1, 2015.
11	*          *          *
12 Section 2.   47:6030(B)(2)(b)(iii) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
13 Section 3.  This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2015; if vetoed by the governor
14and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,
152015, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 510 Engrossed 2015 Regular Session	James
Abstract:  Accelerates the sunset of the solar energy systems tax credit from Dec. 31, 2017
to July 1, 2015.
Present law provides a state income tax credit for the purchase and installation of a solar
energy system on a La. residence.  
Present law provides that the amount of the tax credit for a system purchased by the
homeowner is equal to 50% of the first $25,000 of system cost.  
Present law provides that the amount of the tax credit for a system which is purchased and
installed by a third party through a lease with the owner of the residence is equal to 38% of
the first $25,000 of the cost of purchase, with the following limitations:   
(1)On or after July 1, 2013, and before July 1, 2014, the system shall cost no more than
$4.50 per watt and provide for not more than six kilowatts of energy.
(2)On or after July 1, 2014, and before July 1, 2015, the system shall cost no more than
$3.50 per watt and provide for not more than six kilowatts of energy.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-1100	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 510
(3)On or after July 1, 2015, and before Jan. 1, 2017, the system shall cost no more than
$2 per watt and provide for not more than six kilowatts of energy.
Proposed law changes present law by advancing the sunset date for the program from Dec.
31, 2017, to July 1, 2015.
Repeals provisions governing the cost of a leased system on or after July 1, 2015, and before
Jan. 1, 2017.
Applicable to any system installed on or after July 1, 2015.
Effective July 1, 2015.
(Amends R.S. 47:6030(B)(1) and (2)(a) and (c); Repeals R.S. 47:6030(B)(2)(b)(iii))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.