Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB542 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    GREEN SHEET REDIGEST
HB 542	2015 Regular Session	Schroder
(KEYWORD, SUMMARY, AND DIGEST as amended by Senate committee
amendments)
STUDENT/ASSESSMENT:  Provides relative to contracts by the state Dept. of
Education for English language arts and math assessments for the 2015-2016 school
year
DIGEST
HB 542 Reengrossed 2015 Regular Session	Schroder
Present law provides for the La. Competency-Based Education Program, including the
implementation of statewide standards for required subjects and the La. Educational
Assessment Program (LEAP).  Requires standards-based assessments for required subjects
(English language arts, math, science, and social studies) to be implemented by the State
Board of Elementary and Secondary Education (BESE) and administered in at least grades
3-11.  Provides that such assessments be based on state content standards and rigorous
student achievement standards comparable to national student achievement levels.  Further
requires that the rigor of such assessments shall at least compare to that of national
achievement tests. Requires BESE to establish adequate test scores for determining
successful student performance on the tests. Specifies that beginning with the 2014-2015
school year, the standards-based assessments in English language arts and math shall be
based on nationally recognized content standards.
Proposed law retains present law and additionally provides with respect to assessments to
be administered during the 2015-2016 school year as follows:
(1)Requires the department to enter into a one-year contract, in accordance with the
Louisiana Procurement Code, for assessments to be used in grades three through
eight in English language arts and mathematics.
(2)Provides that not more than 49.9 percent of the questions included in the selected
assessments shall be based upon a blueprint or intellectual property developed by the
Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers consortium, or any
other federally funded consortium of states.
(3)Provides that no question included in the selected assessments shall be based upon
a blueprint or intellectual property developed by a consortium of states predominantly
funded by organizations primarily dedicated to political advocacy.
(4)Requires the commissioner of administration to ensure that any contractor is in full
compliance with the provisions of proposed law.
(5)Requires the commissioner of administration to ensure that a copy of any subcontract
entered into by the selected contractor shall be submitted to the division of
administration within ten calendar days of finalization of the contract.
(6)Requires the state chief procurement officer, in accordance with applicable state law,
to make a final determination regarding the department's request for proposals to
solicit a vendor for the 2015-2016 assessments, not later than July 15, 2015, provided
all requirements of the state procurement code have been met.
(7)Requires the state chief procurement officer, in accordance with applicable state law,
to make a final determination regarding the department's contract for the 2015-2016
assessments, not later than October 15, 2015, provided all requirements of the state
procurement code have been met.
Page 1 of 3
Prepared by Jeanne Johnston. Provides that the provisions of proposed law shall become null and void on July 1, 2016.
Provides that proposed law is effective if House Bill No. 373 and Senate Bill No. 43 of the
2015 R.S. become effective.
(Amends R.S. 17:24.4(F)(1)(a); Adds R.S. 17:24.4(F)(2))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Education to the
original bill:
1. Prohibit the state Dept. of Education from contracting with the PARCC
consortium for assessments for the 2015-2016 school year and require the
department to contract with another vendor, in accordance with the La.
Procurement Code, for assessments for grades 3-10 in English language arts and
math for the 2015-2016 school year.
2. Limit the number of assessment questions that can be based on the blueprint
developed through the PARCC process or processes conducted by a federally
funded consortium of states.
3. Delete proposed law prohibition on implementation of PARCC and Smarter
Balanced and other similar assessments.  Retain present law requiring that
assessments be based on nationally recognized content standards and requiring
that student achievement standards be based on national test scores.
4. Delete proposed law requirement for a parent's or guardian's approval of
administration of an alternate assessment to a student with disabilities.
5. Make proposed law effective if and when House Bill No. 373 and Senate Bill
No. 43 of the 2015 R.S. become effective.
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Limit the number of assessment questions that can be based on the blueprint
developed through processes conducted by a consortium of states funded by
organizations primarily dedicated to political advocacy.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Education to the
reengrossed bill
1. Specifies that proposed law applies only to assessments for the 2015-2016 school
year.
2. Requires DOE to enter into a one-year contract, in accordance with the La.
Procurement Code, for assessments to be used in grades 3 - 8 in English language
arts and mathematics.
3. Requires the commissioner of administration to ensure that the assessment
contractor complies with proposed law.
4. Requires the commissioner of administration to ensure that the assessment
contractor submits a copy of any subcontracts entered into to the division of
administration within 10 days of finalizing the contract.
5. Requires the state chief procurement officer to make a final determination
regarding DOE's request for proposals for a vendor for the 2015-2016 school year
Page 2 of 3
Prepared by Jeanne Johnston. by 7/15/2015, provided all requirements of state law and the state procurement
code are met.
6. Requires the state chief procurement officer to make a final determination
regarding DOE's contract for the 2015-2016 school year, not later than
10/15/2015, provided all requirements of state law and the state procurement
code are met.
7. Provides that proposed law is null and void on 7/1/2016.
Page 3 of 3
Prepared by Jeanne Johnston.