Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB616 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 15RS-1199	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 616
BY REPRESENTATIVE STOKES
TAX/INCOME TAX:  (Constitutional Amendment) Eliminates the state income tax
deduction for federal income taxes paid
1	A JOINT RESOLUTION
2Proposing to amend Article VII, Section 4(A) of the Constitution of Louisiana,  relative to 
3 income taxation; to provide with respect to the deductibility of federal income taxes
4 paid for purposes of computing state income taxes; to provide for an effective date;
5 to provide for submission of the proposed amendment to the electors; and to provide
6 for related matters.
7 Section 1.  Be it resolved by the Legislature of Louisiana, two-thirds of the members
8elected to each house concurring, that there shall be submitted to the electors of the state of
9Louisiana, for their approval or rejection in the manner provided by law, a proposal to
10amend Article VII, Section 4(A) of the Constitution of Louisiana, to read as follows:
11 §4.  Income Tax; Severance Tax; Political Subdivisions
12	Section 4.(A)  Income Tax.  Equal and uniform taxes may be levied on net
13 incomes, and these taxes may be graduated according to the amount of net income. 
14 However, the state individual and joint income tax schedule of rates and brackets
15 shall never not exceed the rates and brackets set forth in Title 47 of the Louisiana
16 Revised Statutes on January 1, 2003 July 1, 2015.  Federal income taxes paid shall
17 be allowed as a deductible item in computing state income taxes for the same period.
18	*          *          *
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-1199	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 616
1 Section 2.  Be it further resolved that the provisions of the amendment contained in
2this Joint Resolution shall be applicable to all tax years beginning on and after January 1,
32015.
4 Section 3.  Be it further resolved that this proposed amendment shall be submitted
5to the electors of the state of Louisiana at the statewide election to be held on October 24,
62015.
7 Section 4.  Be it further resolved that on the official ballot to be used at the election,
8there shall be printed a proposition, upon which the electors of the state shall be permitted
9to vote YES or NO, to amend the Constitution of Louisiana, which proposition shall read as
10follows:
11	Do you support an amendment to eliminate the deductibility of federal
12	income taxes paid in computing state income taxes and to establish a new
13	ceiling on state income tax rates? (Amends Article VII, Section 4(A))
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 616 Original 2015 Regular Session	Stokes
Abstract:  Eliminates the deductibility of federal income taxes paid when computing state
individual and corporate income taxes and establishes a ceiling on state income tax
rates.
Present constitution authorizes equal and uniform taxes to be levied on net income.  Further
authorizes the rates for these taxes to be graduated according to the amount of net income
of the taxpayer; however, the state individual and joint income tax schedule of rates and
brackets are prohibited from exceeding the rates and brackets as they existed on Jan. 1, 2003.
Present constitution provides that state individual and joint income tax rates and brackets
shall never exceed those set forth in Title 47 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes on Jan. 1,
2003.
Proposed constitutional amendment changes present constitution by providing that the rates
and brackets shall never exceed those set on July 1, 2015.
Present constitution authorizes federal income taxes paid to be allowed as a deductible item
in computing state income taxes for the same period.
Proposed constitutional amendment changes present constitution by eliminating the
deductibility of federal income taxes paid when computing both individual and corporate
income tax liability.
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-1199	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 616
Provides for submission of the proposed amendment to the voters at the statewide election
to be held October 24, 2015.
Applicable to all tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2015.
(Amends Const. Art. VII, §4(A))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.