Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB668 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 15RS-1313	ENGROSSED
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 668
BY REPRESENTATIVE HILL
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
FISHING/SHRIMP:  Repeals the prohibition on enforcement of the federal TEDS in shrimp
nets requirement
1	AN ACT
2To repeal R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted by Act 283 of the 1987 Regular Session of the Louisiana
3 Legislature and R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted by Act 891 of the 1987 Regular Session of
4 the Louisiana Legislature, as amended, relative to enforcement of the federal
5 requirement for the use of turtle excluder devices in shrimp trawls; to repeal the
6 prohibition on such enforcement; to require the Louisiana Shrimp Task Force to
7 report to the legislature recommendations for legislation applicable to enforcement
8 of the federal requirements for the use of turtle excluder devices in shrimp trawls
9 used in state waters; to require wildlife agents to wear body cameras; and to provide
10 for related matters.
11Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
12 Section 1.  R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted by Act 283 of the 1987 Regular Session of the
13Louisiana Legislature and R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted by Act 891 of the 1987 Regular Session
14of the Louisiana Legislature, as amended, are hereby repealed in their entirety.
15 Section 2.  From August 1, 2015 to August 1, 2018, a wildlife agent shall wear an
16electronic device capable of recording video and audio data or capable of transmitting video
17and audio data to be recorded remotely at all times while enforcing turtle excluder device
18requirements.
19 Section 3.  No later than February 1, 2018, the Louisiana Shrimp Task Force shall
20submit a written report to the House Committee on Natural Resources and Environment and
21the Senate Committee on Natural Resources with recommendations for whether or not the
22use of turtle excluder devices should be enforced in state waters and the rules and regulations
23under which such devices should be enforced in state waters.
Page 1 of 2 HLS 15RS-1313	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 668
1 Section 4. After the passage of this Act, any person operating as a retail seller of
2seafood who boycotts or otherwise refuses to purchase shrimp caught in Louisiana waters
3shall not be eligible for any tax credit or rebates or any other type of incentive provided by
4the state.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 668 Engrossed 2015 Regular Session	Hill
Abstract:  Repeals the prohibition on enforcement of the federal rules on the use of turtle
excluder devices in shrimp trawls used in state waters.
Present law prohibits the enforcement in state waters of federal regulations that require the
use of turtle excluder devices in shrimp trawls until certain conditions and data can be
determined and verified.
Proposed law repeals present law.
Proposed law requires wildlife agents to wear body cameras from Aug. 1, 2015 to Aug. 1,
2016, at all times while enforcing turtle excluder device requirements.
Proposed law requires the La. Shrimp Task Force to submit a written report to the House
Committee on Natural Resources and Environment and the Senate Committee on Natural
Resources by Feb. 1, 2018, with recommendations for whether or not the use of turtle
excluder devices should be enforced in state waters and the rules and regulations under
which such devices should be enforced in state waters.
Proposed law provides any seafood retailer who boycotts shrimp caught in La. waters after
the passage of proposed law shall be ineligible for any tax credit or rebates or any other type
of incentive provided by the state.
(Repeals R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted by Act 283 of the 1987 R.S. and R.S. 56:57.2 as enacted
by Act 891 of the 1987 R.S. as amended)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Natural Resources and
Environment to the original bill:
1. Require  wildlife agents to wear body cameras from Aug. 1, 2015 to Aug. 1,
2016, at all times while enforcing turtle excluder device requirements.
2. Make any seafood retailer who boycotts shrimp caught in La. waters after the
passage of proposed law ineligible for any tax credit or rebates or any other type
of incentive provided by the state.
Page 2 of 2