Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR5 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 15RS-681	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 5
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
NATURAL RESOURCES DEPT:  Approves the 2015-2016 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan
1	A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
2To approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as adopted by
3 the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and
4 Restoration Authority.
5 WHEREAS, R.S. 30:2000.1 et seq., provides for the creation, duties, and
6responsibilities of the Atchafalaya Basin Program, in the office of the secretary of the
7Department of Natural Resources, and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion
8Board; and
9 WHEREAS, pursuant to R.S. 30:2000.11, a technical advisory group has been
10appointed to review, evaluate, and approve all water management and water quality projects
11proposed for inclusion in an annual plan to determine if the project meets the criteria for
12inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan, and make recommendations to the
13Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board; and
14 WHEREAS, public participation in the development of the Atchafalaya Basin
15Annual Plan is essential to the success of the Atchafalaya Basin Program; and
16 WHEREAS, nominations for water quality projects were accepted from July 1, 2013,
17through June 30, 2014, at which time the technical advisory group reviewed and evaluated
18the water quality projects that were nominated by the public and selected projects for
19inclusion in the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(B); and
20 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was then presented for public
21comment and discussion at meetings that were held on November 5, 2014, in Plaquemine,
Page 1 of 3 HLS 15RS-681	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 5
1Louisiana, on November 6, 2014, in Henderson, Louisiana, and on November 13, 2014, in
2Morgan City, Louisiana; and
3 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Research and Promotion Board at a public
4meeting held on December 2, 2014, in Baton Rouge, Louisiana, after receiving and
5considering the comments of the public, and the recommendations of the Atchafalaya Basin
6Program staff, unanimously approved the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan; and
7 WHEREAS, the draft Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan was submitted on December
83, 2014, to the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority (CPRA) pursuant to R.S.
930:2000.11(E) for their review and approval as consistent with the master plan for coastal
10protection and restoration for a sustainable coast and was unanimously approved by the
11CPRA at its February 11, 2015, meeting; and
12 WHEREAS, at a public meeting held on January 13, 2015, the Atchafalaya Basin
13Research and Promotion Board, as required by R.S. 30:2000.11(D), considered and
14unanimously approved the proposed Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan in its final version; and
15 WHEREAS, such committees must take action on the Atchafalaya Basin Annual
16Plan prior to submission of the plan to the legislature, and the legislature may approve or
17disapprove the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan by resolution adopted by a majority vote of
18the members of each house of the legislature; and
19 WHEREAS, the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan shall not be effective or
20implemented unless both houses of the legislature approve the annual plan or fail to
21disapprove the annual plan; and
22 WHEREAS, the secretary shall implement the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan if the
23legislature approves the plan or if the legislature fails to timely disapprove of the plan.
24 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
25approve the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2015-2016, as presented by the
26secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and adopted by the Atchafalaya Basin
27Research and Promotion Board and the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority.
28 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
29secretary of the Department of Natural Resources and the Atchafalaya Basin Research and
30Promotion Board.
Page 2 of 3 HLS 15RS-681	ORIGINAL
HCR NO. 5
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HCR 5 Original 2015 Regular Session	St. Germain
Approves the 2015-2016 Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan.
Page 3 of 3