Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB24 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 15RS-173	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
SENATE BILL NO. 24
BY SENATOR NEVERS 
TAX EXEMPTIONS.  Extends a non-refundable employer apprenticeship tax credit for
three additional years. (gov sig)
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6033(B)(1), relative to apprenticeship tax credits; to extend
3 the period during which employers are allowed the credits; to provide for an
4 effective date; and to provide for related matters.
5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
6 Section 1. R.S. 47:6033(B)(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
7 ยง6033. Apprenticeship tax credits
8	*          *          *
9	B.(1) For all taxable periods beginning after December 31, 2007, and ending
10 prior to January 1, 2015 2018, employers shall be allowed a non-refundable
11 apprenticeship tax credit against any Louisiana individual or corporation income tax
12 or corporation franchise tax each tax year equal to one dollar for each hour of
13 employment of each eligible apprentice, not to exceed one thousand hours for each
14 eligible apprentice, all as provided for in this Section.
15	*          *          *
16 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
17 signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 24
SLS 15RS-173	ORIGINAL
1 by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If
2 vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
3 effective on the day following such approval.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Laura Gail Sullivan.
DIGEST
SB 24 Original	2015 Regular Session	Nevers
Present law provides for apprenticeship tax credits.  Provides that for all taxable periods
beginning after Dec. 31, 2007, and ending prior to Jan. 1, 2015, employers shall be allowed
a non-refundable apprenticeship tax credit against any La. individual or corporation income
tax or corporation franchise tax each tax year equal to one dollar for each hour of
employment of each eligible apprentice, not to exceed 1,000 hours for each eligible
apprentice as provided in present law.
Proposed law extends the credits in present law for three years for taxable periods ending
prior to Jan. 1, 2018.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 47:6033(B)(1))
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.