RDCSB37 2313 3144 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] SB 37 Reengrossed 2015 Regular Session Morrell Present law requires the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training to develop minimum curriculum requirements for the training of peace officers. Proposed law requires the council to develop and continuously update a POST recognized homicide investigator training program and a sexual assault awareness training program for peace officers that consist of classroom or Internet instruction, or both. Proposed law authorizes the homicide training to include field officer training as prescribed by the council. Proposed law requires that on and after Jan. 1, 2016, each person who is employed as a full- time college or university police officer shall complete a sexual assault awareness training program as provided by the council as provided in proposed law. Proposed law requires each peace officer shall complete a sexual assault awareness training program as provided by the council. Proposed law requires the council to create and maintain a current list of those peace officers who have successfully completed the homicide investigator training program for purposes of coordinating homicide investigations occurring in the state. Proposed law provides that on and after Jan. 1, 2017, only law enforcement officers who successfully complete the homicide investigator training program or receive a waiver of compliance based on prior training or experience as a homicide investigator shall be assigned to lead investigations in homicide cases. Proposed law requires the council to develop the sexual assault awareness training program in a series of modules to include all of the following: (1)The neurobiology of sexual assault and trauma, including victim impact. (2)Response to sexual assault, including but not limited to investigative methods, collecting and securing evidence, and interviewing victims. (3)Applicable federal and state victim's rights laws. Proposed law requires the council to solicit free or no cost training and technical assistance and may accept gifts, grants, and donations from whatever sources are available for purposes of proposed law. Proposed law further requires the council to consult with appropriate governmental agencies and nongovernmental statewide agencies in the development and presentation of the training required by proposed law. Regarding nongovernmental agencies, only agencies whose primary purpose is the delivery of sexual assault services to victims are required to be consulted. Proposed law requires the council to promulgate rules and regulations in accordance with the APA, subject to the oversight of the House Committee on the Administration of Criminal Justice and the Senate Committee on Judiciary B for all of the following: (1)The implementation of a homicide investigator training program no later than July 1, 2016. (2)The implementation of the sexual assault awareness training program for persons employed full-time as college or university police officers no later than Oct. 1, 2015. Page 1 of 2 RDCSB37 2313 3144 (3)The implementation of a sexually assault awareness training program for peace officers as defined in present law no later than January 1, 2017. Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Adds R.S. 17:1805(H) and R.S. 40:2405.8) Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary B to the original bill 1. Changes proposed law homicide investigator training from lead homicide investigator training to POST recognized homicide investigator training. 2. Adds authorization for homicide investigator training programs to include field officer training. 3. Regarding proposed law requirement for appointments to lead investigations in homicide cases, adds authorization for a waiver from homicide investigator training based on prior training or experience as a homicide investigator. Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate 1. Clarifies that peace officers shall complete a sexual assault awareness training program by July 1, 2016. 2. Clarifies that the council shall promulgate rules to implement a homicide investigation training program no later than 7/1/16. Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Judiciary to the reengrossed bill: 1. Add an additional requirement for the council to promulgate rules and regulations relative to the implementation of a sexual assault awareness training program for peace officers no later than Jan. 1, 2017. Page 2 of 2