Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB37 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RDCSB37 2313 3144
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
SB 37 Reengrossed 2015 Regular Session	Morrell
Present law requires the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training to develop
minimum curriculum requirements for the training of peace officers.
Proposed law requires the council to develop and continuously update a POST recognized
homicide investigator training program and a sexual assault awareness training program for
peace officers that consist of classroom or Internet instruction, or both.  Proposed law
authorizes the homicide training to include field officer training as prescribed by the council.
Proposed law requires that on and after Jan. 1, 2016, each person who is employed as a full-
time college or university police officer shall complete a sexual assault awareness training
program as provided by the council as provided in proposed law. 
Proposed law requires each peace officer shall complete a sexual assault awareness training
program as provided by the council.
Proposed law requires the council to create and maintain a current list of those peace officers
who have successfully completed the homicide investigator training program for purposes
of coordinating homicide investigations occurring in the state.  Proposed law provides that
on and after Jan. 1, 2017, only law enforcement officers who successfully complete the 
homicide investigator training program or receive a waiver of compliance based on prior
training or experience as a homicide investigator shall be assigned to lead investigations in
homicide cases.
Proposed law requires the council to develop the sexual assault awareness training program
in a series of modules to include all of the following:
(1)The neurobiology of sexual assault and trauma, including victim impact.
(2)Response to sexual assault, including but not limited to investigative methods,
collecting and securing evidence, and interviewing victims.
(3)Applicable federal and state victim's rights laws.
Proposed law requires the council to solicit free or no cost training and technical assistance
and may accept gifts, grants, and donations from whatever sources are available for purposes
of proposed law.  Proposed law further requires the council to consult with appropriate
governmental agencies and nongovernmental statewide agencies in the development and
presentation of the training required by proposed law.  Regarding nongovernmental
agencies, only agencies whose primary purpose is the delivery of sexual assault services to
victims are required to be consulted.
Proposed law requires the council to promulgate rules and regulations in accordance with
the APA, subject to the oversight of the House Committee on the Administration of Criminal
Justice and the Senate Committee on Judiciary B for all of the following:
(1)The implementation of a homicide investigator training program no later than July
1, 2016. 
(2)The implementation of the sexual assault awareness training program for persons
employed full-time as college or university police officers no later than Oct. 1, 2015.
Page 1 of 2 RDCSB37 2313 3144
(3)The implementation of a sexually assault awareness training program for peace
officers as defined in present law no later than January 1, 2017.
Effective upon signature of the governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Adds R.S. 17:1805(H) and R.S. 40:2405.8)
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary B to the
original bill
1. Changes proposed law homicide investigator training from lead homicide
investigator training to POST recognized homicide investigator training.
2. Adds authorization for homicide investigator training programs to include
field officer training.
3. Regarding proposed law requirement for appointments to lead investigations
in homicide cases, adds authorization for a waiver from homicide
investigator training based on prior training or experience as a homicide
investigator.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
1. Clarifies that peace officers shall complete a sexual assault awareness
training program by July 1, 2016.
2. Clarifies that the council shall promulgate rules to implement a homicide
investigation training program no later than 7/1/16.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Judiciary to the
reengrossed bill:
1. Add an additional requirement for the council to promulgate rules and
regulations relative to the implementation of a sexual assault awareness training
program for peace officers no later than Jan. 1, 2017.
Page 2 of 2