RÉSUMÉ DIGEST Act 152 (SB 37) 2015 Regular Session Morrell Prior law required the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training (Council) to develop minimum curriculum requirements for the training of peace officers. New law requires the council to develop and continuously update a POST recognized homicide investigator training program and a sexual assault awareness training program for peace officers that consist of classroom or Internet instruction, or both. New law authorizes the homicide training to include field officer training as prescribed by the council. New law requires that, on and after Jan. 1, 2016, each person employed as a full-time college or university police officer complete a sexual assault awareness training program as provided by the council. New law requires that the council develop and continuously update homicide investigator and sexual assault awareness training programs for peace officers which consist of classroom or Internet instruction, or both. Provides that the training programs may include field officer training. Requires that the council create and maintain a current list of peace officers who have successfully completed the homicide investigator training program for purposes of coordinating homicide investigations occurring in the state. Provides that on and after Jan. 1, 2017, only law enforcement officers who successfully complete the homicide investigator training program or receive a waiver of compliance based on prior training or experience as a homicide investigator shall be assigned to lead investigations in homicide cases. New law requires that the council develop the sexual assault awareness training program in a series of modules which include all of the following items: (1)The neurobiology of sexual assault and trauma, including victim impact. (2)Response to sexual assault, including but not limited to investigative methods, collecting and securing evidence, and interviewing victims. (3)Applicable federal and state victim's rights laws. New law requires that the council solicit free or no-cost training and technical assistance and may accept gifts, grants, and donations from whatever sources are. Further requires that the council consult with appropriate governmental agencies and nongovernmental statewide agencies in the development and presentation of the training required by new law. Provides that only nongovernmental agencies whose primary purpose is the delivery of sexual assault services to victims are required to be consulted. New law requires that the council promulgate rules and regulations in accordance with the APA, subject to legislative oversight by the House Committee on the Administration of Criminal Justice and the Senate Committee on Judiciary B, for the following training programs: (1)The implementation of a homicide investigator training program no later than July 1, 2016. (2)The implementation of the sexual assault awareness training program for persons employed full-time as college or university police officers no later than Oct. 1, 2015. (3)The implementation of a sexually assault awareness training program for peace officers no later than January 1, 2017. Prior law defined "peace officer" as any full-time employee of the state, a municipality, a sheriff, or other public agency, whose permanent duties actually include the making of arrests, the performing of searches and seizures, or the execution of criminal warrants, and is responsible for the prevention or detection of crime or for the enforcement of the penal, traffic, or highway laws of this state, but not including any elected or appointed head of a law enforcement department. Effective upon signature of the governor (June 23, 2015). (Adds R.S. 17:1805(H) and R.S. 40:2405.8)