SLS 15RS-1724 ORIGINAL 2015 Regular Session SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 98 BY SENATORS CORTEZ, ALLAIN, GUILLORY, LAFLEUR, MILLS, MORRISH AND PERRY AND REPRESENTATI VE STUART BISHOP COMMENDATIONS. Commends posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or were slain in the line of duty. 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2 To commend posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died 3 or were slain in the line of duty. 4 WHEREAS, it is appropriate to recognize these law enforcement officers from the 5 Acadiana region who made the ultimate sacrifice in the valiant performance of their duties; 6 and 7 WHEREAS, from the Abbeville Police Department, Officer John Hardy died in the 8 line of duty on December 22, 1992; and 9 WHEREAS, from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Department, Deputy Lester Threats 10 died in the line of duty on October 18, 1988; and 11 WHEREAS, from the Crowley Police Department, the following officers died or 12 were slain in the line of duty: Officer Ezra Foreman on May 4, 1959, Officer Anthony Suire 13 on September 6, 1962, and Lieutenant Richard Newman on February 19, 1993; and 14 WHEREAS, from the Evangeline Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers 15 died or were slain in the line of duty: Deputy Charles Smith on April 16, 2003, Deputy 16 Maurice Brignac on June 1, 2005, and Deputy Jeremy Carter on December 19, 2008; and 17 WHEREAS, from the Henderson Police Department, Patrolman Julius Courville died 18 in the line of duty on August 26, 1978; and Page 1 of 4 SCR NO. 98 SLS 15RS-1724 ORIGINAL 1 WHEREAS, from the Jefferson Davis Sheriff's Department, Deputy James Phillips 2 died in the line of duty on May 30, 1999; and 3 WHEREAS, from the Jennings Police Department, the following officers died or 4 were slain in the line of duty: City Marshall Cameron Coffin on July 15, 1906, and 5 Patrolman Burton LeBlanc on February 5, 2000; and 6 WHEREAS, from the Kaplan Police Department, Officer Rodney Trahan died in the 7 line of duty on April 4, 1969; and 8 WHEREAS, from the Lafayette Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers 9 died or were slain in the line of duty: Deputy Willie Stutes on July 10, 1927, and Deputy 10 Myra Mouton on February 26, 2015; and 11 WHEREAS, from the Lafayette Police Department, the following officers died or 12 were slain in the line of duty: Officer Simon Chaisson on July 11, 1926, Captain Harold 13 Abadie on May 20, 1959, Detective Sergeant Leroy King on May 20, 1959, Captain John 14 "Rocky" Langlinais on July 22, 1960, and Police Officer First Class Edward Burch on 15 January 5, 1969; and 16 WHEREAS, from the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries the following officers 17 died or were slain in the line of duty: Agent Frank Fagot Jr., on November 29, 1927, Agent 18 Kenneth Aycock on July 6, 1991, Agent Ricky Dodge on January 21, 1992, Senior Agent 19 Leon Henderson Jr. on March 20, 1996, Captain John Garlington on February 10, 2000, 20 Senior Agent Jim Matkin on March 2, 2005, and Sergeant Paul Stuckey on September 30, 21 2011; and 22 WHEREAS, from the Louisiana State Police, the following officers died or were 23 slain in the line of duty: Officer Neill Yarborough Sr. on February 25, 1925, Highway 24 Patrolman Frank David Sr. on October 9, 1933, Patrolman Victor Mossy on May 13, 1936, 25 Trooper James Brownfield on May 9, 1943, Trooper Ulis Floyd on February 24, 1952, 26 Trooper Wilmer Moody on November 10, 1956, Trooper James Pollard on November 20, 27 1956, Sergeant Eli Smith on January 17, 1957, Trooper Francis Zinna on March 24, 1958, 28 Trooper Rudolph Miller on September 8, 1962, Lieutenant Joseph D. Ferris on February 23, 29 1968, Trooper Huey Grace on October 30, 1968, Trooper William Warrington on July 17, 30 1973, Trooper Lamon Weaver on April 17, 1973, Sergeant Clarence Miller Jr. on December Page 2 of 4 SCR NO. 98 SLS 15RS-1724 ORIGINAL 1 4, 1975, Trooper First Class Donald Cleveland Sr. on July 2, 1977, Trooper Jean-Claude 2 Crescionne on April 20, 1982, Trooper Damon Robichaux on July 21, 1982, Trooper 3 William Kees on February 5, 1983, Master Trooper Stephen Gray on May 29, 1995, 4 Sergeant George Johnston on November 17, 1997, Trooper Hung Le on June 30, 1998, 5 Trooper Duane Dalton on January 12, 2010, and Corporal John Kendall on August 9, 2011; 6 and 7 WHEREAS, from the New Iberia Police Department, the following officers died or 8 were slain in the line of duty: Officer Warren Narcisse Jr. on February 28, 1984, and Officer 9 Chad Elkins on October 25, 2000; and 10 WHEREAS, from the Opelousas Police Department, the following officers died or 11 were slain in the line of duty: Lieutenant Joseph Richard Jr. on September 28, 2010, and 12 Assistant Warren Peggy Sylvester on April 14, 2013; and 13 WHEREAS, from the Port Barre Police Department, Police Chief David Richard 14 died in the line of duty on August 5, 2007; and 15 WHEREAS, from the Rayne Police Department, Marshal Americus Lyons died in 16 the line of duty on December 24, 1894; and 17 WHEREAS, from the St. Landry Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers 18 died in the line of duty: Deputy Marion Swords on July 17, 1916, and Deputy Carlos 19 Papillion on January 28, 2014; and 20 WHEREAS, from the St. Martin Parish Sheriff's Department, Corporal James 21 Courville died in the line of duty on June 13, 2000; and 22 WHEREAS, from the St. Mary Parish Sheriff's Department, Detective John Kahl 23 died in the line of duty on June 4, 1980; and 24 WHEREAS, from the Sunset Police Department, Officer Theodore Devalcourt died 25 in the line of duty on February 25, 1932; and 26 WHEREAS, from the Vermilion Parish Sheriff's Department, Deputy Allen Bares 27 Jr. died in the line of duty on June 23, 2014; and 28 WHEREAS, these law enforcement officers died nobly in the act of protecting their 29 fellow citizens, preserving order in our society; they are to be saluted for how they lived, and 30 applauded for their dedication to valor and integrity; and Page 3 of 4 SCR NO. 98 SLS 15RS-1724 ORIGINAL 1 WHEREAS, the people of Louisiana owe these fallen officers a deep debt of 2 appreciation; and 3 WHEREAS, these officers are to be honored by acknowledging their 4 professionalism, perseverance, and compassion, and will forever be held as models for all 5 who strive to uphold the ideals of this great state and nation. 6 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby 7 commend posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or 8 were slain in the line of duty. 9 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 10 Abbeville Police Department, the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Department, the Crowley Police 11 Department, the Evangeline Parish Sheriff's Department, the Henderson Police Department, 12 the Jefferson Davis Sheriff's Department, the Jennings Police Department, the Kaplan Police 13 Department, the Lafayette Parish Sheriff's Department, the Lafayette Police Department, the 14 Department of Wildlife and Fisheries, the Louisiana State Police, the New Iberia Police 15 Department, the Opelousas Police Department, the Port Barre Police Department, the Rayne 16 Police Department, the St. Landry Parish Sheriff's Department, the St. Martin Parish 17 Sheriff's Department, the St. Mary Parish Sheriff's Department, the Sunset Police 18 Department, and the Vermilion Parish Sheriff's Department. The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Michelle Broussard-Johnson. DIGEST SCR 98 Original 2015 Regular Session Cortez Commends posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or were slain in the line of duty. Page 4 of 4