Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR98 Enrolled / Bill

                    2015 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 98
BY SENATORS CORTEZ, ALLAIN, GUILLORY, LAFLEUR, MILLS, MORRISH AND
PERRY AND REPRESENTATI VE STUART BISHOP 
A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION
To commend posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died
or were slain in the line of duty.
WHEREAS, it is appropriate to recognize these law enforcement officers from the
Acadiana region who made the ultimate sacrifice in the valiant performance of their duties;
and
WHEREAS, from the Abbeville Police Department, Officer John Hardy died in the
line of duty on December 22, 1992; and
WHEREAS, from the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Department, Deputy Lester Threats
died in the line of duty on October 18, 1988; and
WHEREAS, from the Crowley Police Department, the following officers died or
were slain in the line of duty: Officer Ezra Foreman on May 4, 1959, Officer Anthony Suire
on September 6, 1962, and Lieutenant Richard Newman on February 19, 1993; and
WHEREAS, from the Evangeline Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers
died or were slain in the line of duty: Deputy Charles Smith on April 16, 2003, Deputy
Maurice Brignac on June 1, 2005, and Deputy Jeremy Carter on December 19, 2008; and
WHEREAS, from the Henderson Police Department, Patrolman Julius Courville died
in the line of duty on August 26, 1978; and
WHEREAS, from the Jefferson Davis Sheriff's Department, Deputy James Phillips
died in the line of duty on May 30, 1999; and
WHEREAS, from the Jennings Police Department, the following officers died or
were slain in the line of duty: City Marshal Cameron Coffin on July 15, 1906, and Patrolman
Burton LeBlanc on February 5, 2000; and
WHEREAS, from the Kaplan Police Department, Officer Rodney Trahan died in the
line of duty on April 4, 1969; and
Page 1 of 4 SCR NO. 98	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, from the Lafayette Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers
died or were slain in the line of duty: Deputy Willie Stutes on July 10, 1927, and Deputy
Myra Mouton on February 26, 2015; and
WHEREAS, from the Lafayette Police Department, the following officers died or
were slain in the line of duty: Officer Simon Chaisson on July 11, 1926, Captain Harold
Abadie on May 20, 1959, Detective Sergeant Leroy King on May 20, 1959, Captain John
"Rocky" Langlinais on July 22, 1960, and Police Officer First Class Edward Burch on
January 5, 1969; and
WHEREAS, from the Department of Wildlife and Fisheries the following officers
died or were slain in the line of duty: Agent Frank Fagot Jr., on November 29, 1927, Agent
Kenneth Aycock on July 6, 1991, Agent Ricky Dodge on January 21, 1992, Senior Agent
Leon Henderson Jr. on March 20, 1996, Captain John Garlington on February 10, 2000,
Senior Agent Jim Matkin on March 2, 2005, and Sergeant Paul Stuckey on September 30,
2011; and
WHEREAS, from the Louisiana State Police, the following officers died or were
slain in the line of duty: Officer Neill Yarborough Sr. on February 25, 1925, Highway
Patrolman Frank David Sr. on October 9, 1933, Patrolman Victor Mossy on May 13, 1936,
Trooper James Brownfield on May 9, 1943, Trooper Ulis Floyd on February 24, 1952,
Trooper Wilmer Moody on November 10, 1956, Trooper James Pollard on November 20,
1956, Sergeant Eli Smith on January 17, 1957, Trooper Francis Zinna on March 24, 1958,
Trooper Rudolph Miller on September 8, 1962, Lieutenant Joseph D. Ferris on February 23,
1968, Trooper Huey Grace on October 30, 1968, Trooper William Warrington on July 17,
1973, Trooper Lamon Weaver on April 17, 1973, Sergeant Clarence Miller Jr. on December
4, 1975, Trooper First Class Donald Cleveland Sr. on July 2, 1977, Trooper Jean-Claude
Crescionne on April 20, 1982, Trooper Damon Robichaux on July 21, 1982, Trooper
William Kees on February 5, 1983, Master Trooper Stephen Gray on May 29, 1995,
Sergeant George Johnston on November 17, 1997, Trooper Hung Le on June 30, 1998,
Trooper Duane Dalton on January 12, 2010, and Corporal John Kendall on August 9, 2011;
and
Page 2 of 4 SCR NO. 98	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, from the New Iberia Police Department, the following officers died or
were slain in the line of duty: Officer Warren Narcisse Jr. on February 28, 1984, and Officer
Chad Elkins on October 25, 2000; and
WHEREAS, from the Opelousas Police Department, the following officers died or
were slain in the line of duty: Lieutenant Joseph Richard Jr. on September 28, 2010, and
Assistant Warren Peggy Sylvester on April 14, 2013; and
WHEREAS, from the Port Barre Police Department, Police Chief David Richard
died in the line of duty on August 5, 2007; and
WHEREAS, from the Rayne Police Department, Marshal Americus Lyons died in
the line of duty on December 24, 1894; and
WHEREAS, from the St. Landry Parish Sheriff's Department, the following officers
died in the line of duty: Deputy Marion Swords on July 17, 1916, and Deputy Carlos
Papillion on January 28, 2014; and
WHEREAS, from the St. Martin Parish Sheriff's Department, Corporal James
Courville died in the line of duty on June 13, 2000; and
WHEREAS, from the St. Mary Parish Sheriff's Department, Detective John Kahl
died in the line of duty on June 4, 1980; and
WHEREAS, from the Sunset Police Department, Officer Theodore Devalcourt died
in the line of duty on February 25, 1932; and
WHEREAS, from the Vermilion Parish Sheriff's Department, Deputy Allen Bares
Jr. died in the line of duty on June 23, 2014; and
WHEREAS, these law enforcement officers died nobly in the act of protecting their
fellow citizens, preserving order in our society; they are to be saluted for how they lived, and
applauded for their dedication to valor and integrity; and
WHEREAS, the people of Louisiana owe these fallen officers a deep debt of
appreciation; and
WHEREAS, these officers are to be honored by acknowledging their
professionalism, perseverance, and compassion, and will forever be held as models for all
who strive to uphold the ideals of this great state and nation.
Page 3 of 4 SCR NO. 98	ENROLLED
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby
commend posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or
were slain in the line of duty.
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the
Abbeville Police Department, the Acadia Parish Sheriff's Department, the Crowley Police
Department, the Evangeline Parish Sheriff's Department, the Henderson Police Department,
the Jefferson Davis Sheriff's Department, the Jennings Police Department, the Kaplan Police
Department, the Lafayette Parish Sheriff's Department, the Lafayette Police Department, the 
Department of Wildlife and Fisheries, the Louisiana State Police, the New Iberia Police
Department, the Opelousas Police Department, the Port Barre Police Department, the Rayne
Police Department, the St. Landry Parish Sheriff's Department, the St. Martin Parish
Sheriff's Department, the St. Mary Parish Sheriff's Department, the Sunset Police
Department, and the Vermilion Parish Sheriff's Department. 
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Page 4 of 4