Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR39 Enrolled / Bill

                    2015 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 39
BY SENATOR JOHNS 
A RESOLUTION
To commend the Greater St. Mary Missionary Baptist Church of Lake Charles upon its
history and accomplishments.
WHEREAS, in 1939, God spoke to Dr. R. B. House to build a church in the home
of Sister Duhon, and Greater Saint Mary Missionary Baptist Church was organized with the
help of two ministers, Dr. N. P. Jones and Dr. W. C. Clark; and
WHEREAS, on March 8, 1939, the pastor and nine members leased land and built
a small church at 102 Adams Street, which in the beginning was blessed with one Deacon
and one Deaconess, Bro and Sis Eddy Watts; and
WHEREAS, in 1940 with seventeen members, the church moved to Simmons Street
consisting of three deacons, Mother Duhon, Sis Eddy Watts and Sis Sam Blue, the first
secretary Sis Artie Blue, and witnessed its first baptism; and
WHEREAS, in 1945, the John Nash family united with the church, and, in 1946,
other deacons were added, John Nash, C. Goins, Sam Jenkins and Tom Ford, bringing the
number of deacons to seven, and later the Retel Nash family placed their membership with
the church; and
WHEREAS, in 1947, the church temporarily moved from Simmons Street to a
location on a lot purchased from Lumberman Supply Company, during which time the pastor
and members purchased two more lots from the Pauley Agency where the church was built
at 1917 Harless Street; and
WHEREAS, a fire destroyed the church in 1959 and services were held in the
pastor's home at 2009 Medora Street and in a tent while the church was being rebuilt in 1960
with Sis Fannie Breaux serving as Building Fund Chairperson; and 
WHEREAS, during the period of 1969 to 1983, four air conditioners were purchased;
several classrooms, a larger choir stand and new restrooms were added; a Hammond Organ
was purchased; new stained glass windows, two front glass doors were purchased and
Page 1 of 4 SR NO. 39	ENROLLED
installed; a new church steeple and an outdoor bulletin board were added; a public
announcement system, pastor's office, secretary and usher rooms were purchased; new
church lights were installed; new carpet was purchased; two church buses were purchased;
new pews, pulpit set, and Lord's Supper table were purchased; a new piano was purchased;
new parking lots were added; and a set of drums was purchased; and 
WHEREAS, Dr. R. B. House passed away on Sunday, December 4, 1983, ending
forty-four years of leadership at Greater St. Mary Missionary Baptist Church; and
WHEREAS, on February 3, 1984, Reverend Samuel C. Tolbert Jr. became the pastor
while still a student at Bishop College in Dallas, Texas, as he commuted until July 1986
when he received his bachelor of arts degree; and
WHEREAS, having been led, taught and trained by Dr. R. B. House, Pastor Tolbert
kept building on a solid foundation and the church flourished under his leadership; and 
WHEREAS, in the 1980s, sidewalks and concrete slabs for the pastor's parking were
added, the Dr. R. B. House Memorial Library on Harless Street was dedicated, five lots were
purchased; the Bus Ministry, Sick & Shut-In Ministry, Nursing Home Visitation, Christian
Education Department, and Scholarship Programs were instated, a copy machine was
purchased, the church's first full-time secretary, Sis Dorothy Moore, began working on a
daily basis, new carpet was installed, repair work was done to the sanctuary, lots were
cleared and leveled for a parking lot, the first church van was purchased, and renovations to
the fellowship hall and two additional bathrooms were added; and
WHEREAS, in the 1990s, a house on the west side of the church was purchased and
has since been turned into the Administrative Education Annex; Rev. Freddie Thomas was
appointed as the first full-time Director of Evangelism/Discipleship Ministry by Pastor
Tolbert and began working on March 25, 1991; twenty-three acres of land in the Lebleu
Settlement off of Ira Breaux Road was acquired to be developed into the Prospect 2000
Retreat and Retirement Center; a building for a Day Care and Learning Center at 603 Blake
Street was purchased, three houses were donated to the church - "Bartie House" by Barbara
Johnson and Julia Barker, "Elton & Maude Lemonia House" by Deacon Harold and
Deaconess Jocelyn Duhon, and "C. N. Frank House" by Pastor Samuel and Sis Matilda
Tolbert; and
Page 2 of 4 SR NO. 39	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, in 1997, the "On Patrol for Jesus" ministry, an Evangelism movement
held from 9 p.m. to 12 midnight every Saturday night, was instituted; and
WHEREAS, in the 2000s, a 4.5-acre tract of land with four buildings totaling over
40,000 square feet was purchased and named Greater St. Mary Complex; a twelve-unit
apartment complex by the name of Amber Gardens was donated and renamed "Pearl Pines
Apartments"; and a house at 613 Jackson Street was donated, which became known as "The
Homeowners Project 2000"; and
WHEREAS, as of 2001, the church had fourteen main ministries - Evangelism, New
Members, Christian Education, Women Mission, Service, Music, Seasoned Saints, Youth,
Children, Administrative, Prospect 2000, Recreation, GSM Community Development, and
Small Groups; and
WHEREAS, on January 7, 2001, during the 11 a.m. worship service, Pastor Tolbert
gave a message entitled "The Next Level Vision" based on Habakkuk 2:1-3, which tells
God's people to write the vision, read vision, run with the vision, and wait for the vision, and
"The Next Level Vision" is in writing and available for each family at the church; and
WHEREAS, the vision became reality as in early 2002, the church launched the
"Move in with Us" campaign as the congregation moved into the church gym, considered
Phase I; and
WHEREAS, the Greater St. Mary Missionary Baptist Church participated with 1,532
other churches in the Forty Days of Purpose fall campaign, which moved the church into the
Purpose Driven church strategy; and
WHEREAS, the church's mission statement was developed using five key words to
summarize Christ's five purposes for His Church - magnify, mission, membership, maturity
and ministry; and 
WHEREAS, colors were selected for each purpose and displayed two months each
year, the Circles of Commitment were developed (a movement of people from the outer to
the inner circle), Saints Advance Leadership Training (SALT) Classes were organized, and
the Life Development Process (Curriculum 101-401) was used to apply the five purposes;
and
Page 3 of 4 SR NO. 39	ENROLLED
WHEREAS, in 2003 Pastor Tolbert was elected General Secretary of the National
Baptist Convention of America, Inc., and in 2005 he became the president of the Louisiana
Home and Foreign Mission Baptist State Convention; and
WHEREAS, in January 2006, Pastor Tolbert presented GSM's Goals/Vision for the
year alining them with the five purposes of the church and led the church into a "Debit
Retirement Campaign" using the Small Groups structure and appointed Bro Roy and Sis
Audrey Guillory to coordinate the activity; and
WHEREAS, in December 2006, the remaining debt was paid off, and on December
31, 2006, a Mortgage Burning Ceremony was held during Watch Night Service; and
WHEREAS, in 2008, an eight-acre tract of land was purchased for a future
community development initiative; and 
WHEREAS, the Greater St. Mary Missionary Baptist Church is an inspiration not
only to its members, but also to the entire Lake Charles community and merits a special
measure of commendation. 
THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
does hereby commend St. Mary Missionary Baptist Church of Lake Charles for over
seventy-five years of growth and the church members and leaders in their creation of a
loving and dedicated spiritual community and does hereby wish them full measures of
success, happiness, and richest blessings in all of their future endeavors. 
BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
Reverend Samuel C. Tolbert Jr.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
Page 4 of 4