Louisiana 2015 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR95 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 15RS-1014	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 95
BY SENATOR DORSEY-COLOMB 
COMMENDATIONS.  Commends Loretta Lynch on becoming the first African-American
woman to serve as Attorney General of the United States.
1	A RESOLUTION
2 To commend and congratulate Loretta Lynch on being the first African-American woman
3 to be sworn in as Attorney General of the United States.
4 WHEREAS, it is with great pleasure that the members of the Senate of the
5 Legislature of Louisiana have learned that Loretta Lynch has been confirmed by the United
6 States Senate, making her the first African-American woman and the second woman to be
7 confirmed for the position; and
8 WHEREAS, Loretta Elizabeth Lynch was born on May 21, 1959, to Lorenzo and
9 Lorine Lynch in Greensboro, North Carolina, and in 2007, married Stephen Hargrove; and 
10 WHEREAS, Lynch attended Harvard College where she was a chartering member
11 of the Xi Tau chapter of Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc. and earned a Bachelor of Arts in
12 English and American Literature in 1981, and a Juris Doctor from Harvard Law School in
13 1984; and
14 WHEREAS, in 1990, Lynch first joined the U.S. Attorney General's office for the
15 Eastern District of New York as an assistant U.S. Attorney prosecuting drug and violent
16 crimes; and
17 WHEREAS, from 1994 to 1998, she served as the chief of the Long Island office and
18 from 1998 to 1999, she was named chief assistant U.S. Attorney in the Eastern District of
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 95
SLS 15RS-1014	ORIGINAL
1 New York and headed the Brooklyn office; and
2 WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch was nominated by President Bill Clinton and confirmed
3 by the United States Senate to serve as the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of New
4 York from June 2, 1999, to May 2, 2001; and
5 WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch was nominated by President Barack Obama and
6 confirmed by the United States Senate to serve as the U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District
7 of New York for a second term from May 8, 2010, to April 27, 2015; and 
8 WHEREAS, as U.S. Attorney, Lynch earned a reputation as a highly qualified, but
9 low profile prosecutor who has a good relationship with law enforcement and a history of
10 handling tough cases well; and 
11 WHEREAS, on November 8, 2014, President Barack Obama nominated Lynch for
12 the position of U.S. Attorney General to succeed Eric Holder, and she was confirmed by the
13 United States Senate Judiciary Committee of February 26, 2015 and approved by the United
14 States Senate on April 23, 2015; and 
15 WHEREAS, Attorney Lynch serves as an example to all that hard work and
16 persistence do indeed pay off; and 
17 WHEREAS, the success of equal justice for all, the strength of our communities, and
18 the overall vitality of American society depend, in great measure, upon people like United
19 States Attorney General Loretta Lynch; and
20 WHEREAS, her extraordinary accomplishments and contributions to the nation are
21 exemplary and commendable, and her work will continue to be recognized and appreciated
22 for generations to come.
23 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
24 does hereby commend and congratulate United States Attorney General Loretta Lynch on
25 being the first African-American woman to serve as United States Attorney General.
26 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
27 Attorney General Loretta Lynch.
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 95
SLS 15RS-1014	ORIGINAL
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Michael Bell.
DIGEST
SR 95 Original	2015 Regular Session Dorsey-Colomb
Commends Loretta Lynch on becoming the first African-American woman to serve as
Attorney General of the United States.
Page 3 of 3