Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR27

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends Dr. Milton Hughes on his retirement from the Livingston Parish School Board and on 44 years of dedicated public service.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR28

Introduced
4/13/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Passed
4/21/15  
Commends NASA on its significant accomplishments, both technical and scientific, and the Michoud Assembly Facility for its contributions to these advances which have positively impacted both the nation and the state of Louisiana.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR29

Introduced
4/13/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Report Pass
4/21/15  
Passed
4/22/15  
Passed
4/22/15  
Engrossed
4/22/15  
Engrossed
4/22/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Extends the Capital Punishment Fiscal Impact Commission study and reporting deadline until January 1, 2018.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR3

Introduced
4/1/15  
Refer
4/1/15  
Refer
4/13/15  
Suspends from July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, all exclusions, exemptions, deductions, credits, and lower rates granted against severance taxes.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR30

Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Designates April 28, 2015, as Purple and Teal Day and recognizes the efforts of the Louisiana Coalition Against Domestic Violence.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR31

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Commends Keith Martin on his retirement from the Livingston Parish School Board.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR32

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends posthumously law enforcement officers from the Acadiana region who died or were slain in the line of duty.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR33

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Commends the Public Administration Institute Student Association (PAISA) at Louisiana State University and to recognize April 13, 2015, as the seventeenth annual PAISA Day at the Louisiana Legislature.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR34

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Refer
4/27/15  
Report Pass
5/6/15  
Report Pass
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Engrossed
5/12/15  
Engrossed
5/12/15  
Refer
5/13/15  
Refer
5/13/15  
Report Pass
5/20/15  
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals, the Department of Education, the Medicaid managed care organizations, and representatives of the Whole Child Initiative to work together to develop a plan to implement the Whole School, Whole Community, Whole Child model developed by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR35

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends Charles "Charlie" Adams for being named as one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR36

Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends Anderson "Andy" W. Barham for being named one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR37

Introduced
4/14/15  
Introduced
4/14/15  
Passed
4/15/15  
Engrossed
4/15/15  
Commends the Louisiana Developmental Disabilities Council and its grassroots advocacy network, LaCAN, for its advocacy efforts to support that people with disabilities be allowed to live independently and become integrated and included in all facets of community living, and to designate April 29, 2015, as Disability Rights Day in Louisiana.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR38

Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Engrossed
4/21/15  
Extends the Louisiana Legislature's condolences on the death of former state Senator Erle Edwards Barham.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR39

Introduced
4/15/15  
Introduced
4/15/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Passed
4/20/15  
Commends Melanie Benit for her time as Chairwoman of the Louisiana Federation of College Republicans.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR4

Introduced
4/1/15  
Refer
4/1/15  
Suspends from July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, certain exclusions, exemptions, deductions, or credits against the corporation income tax and the corporation franchise tax.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records