Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR119

Introduced
5/14/15  
Introduced
5/14/15  
Passed
5/18/15  
Recognizes Tuesday, May 19, 2015, as the 31st Annual Red and White Day at the Louisiana Legislature.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR12

Introduced
4/13/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Refer
4/14/15  
Report Pass
4/21/15  
Report Pass
4/21/15  
Extends the Pretrial Service Commission deadline until March 1, 2017.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR120

Introduced
5/18/15  
Introduced
5/18/15  
Refer
5/19/15  
Refer
5/19/15  
Report Pass
6/1/15  
Passed
6/2/15  
Requests the Senate Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs to study and make recommendations on how to establish recurring funding for the Louisiana Housing Trust Fund.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR121

Introduced
5/18/15  
Introduced
5/18/15  
Passed
5/19/15  
Commends Ethan Coker for being named Louisiana's Middle/Junior High School Student of the Year.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR122

Introduced
5/18/15  
Passed
5/19/15  
Commends William Sommers as the recipient of the prestigious Don E. Wydra Memorial Award for his extraordinary contributions to juvenile justice and delinquency prevention.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR123

Introduced
5/18/15  
Introduced
5/18/15  
Refer
5/19/15  
Refer
5/19/15  
Requests DOTD to convert inside shoulder of I-12 between the I-10/I-12 split and Walker to a travel lane.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR124

Introduced
5/18/15  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Rebecca "Becky" Underwood Brechtel.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR125

Introduced
5/18/15  
Designates May 20, 2015, as LouisianaChildren.org Day at the Louisiana State Capitol and recognizes the efforts of LouisianaChildren.org in striving to give every child in Louisiana the opportunity to thrive.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR126

Introduced
5/18/15  
Introduced
5/18/15  
Commends Carol "Fran" Nevers on being named the 2015 Louisiana CASA DCFS Staff Member of the Year.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR127

Introduced
5/19/15  
Passed
5/20/15  
Commends and congratulates Joshua Phillips for leading a team of LSU students to China for humanitarian work for one year.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR128

Introduced
5/19/15  
Introduced
5/19/15  
Commends Keith Thomas Reed on completing the 2015 Memorial Hermann Ironman North American Championship Texas on May 16, 2015.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR129

Introduced
5/19/15  
Passed
5/20/15  
Commends Cory Bahr on his many extraordinary accomplishments.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR13

Introduced
4/13/15  
Introduced
4/13/15  
Passed
4/14/15  
Recognizes Wednesday, April 29, 2015, as Eating Disorder Awareness and Prevention Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR130

Introduced
5/19/15  
Refer
5/20/15  
Report Pass
6/1/15  
Report Pass
6/1/15  
Passed
6/2/15  
Requests the Board of Elementary and Secondary Education and the state Department of Education to study the implementation and effectiveness of the Positive Behavioral Interventions and Supports program in public schools.
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR131

Introduced
5/19/15  
Introduced
5/19/15  
Passed
5/25/15  
Expresses condolences on the death of Lloyd Francis Reynaud.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records