Louisiana 2016 2016 1st Special Session

Louisiana House Bill HB22 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REP ORT DIGEST
HB 22	2016 First Extraordinary Session	Jackson
Keyword and oneliner of the instrument as it left the House
TAX/TAX REBATES:  Repeals the three-year sunset of certain reductions to tax rebates  (Item #11)
Report adopts Senate amendments to:
1. Provide an exception to the La. Quality Jobs program application filing requirement provided
in present law or projects for which an advance notification is filed on or after Jan. 1, 2014,
and before Jan. 31, 2014, and authorizes applications for those projects to be filed prior to
Jan. 31, 2016.
2. Make technical changes.
Report amends the bill to:
1. Provide that in the event the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First
Extraordinary Session of the Legislature is enacted and becomes effective, the provisions of
Sections 1, 2, and 3 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session shall remain in effect
through the termination date in the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First
Extraordinary Session of the Legislature.
Digest of the bill as proposed by the Conference Committee
Present law sunsets on June 30, 2018, the 28% reductions made in Act No. 126 of the 2015 R.S. to
the following corporate income tax deductions and exclusions:
(1)R.S. 47:51 Exclusions from gross income; governmental subsidies
(2)R.S. 47:158 Basis for depletion (oil and gas wells)
(3)R.S. 47:246 Corporations; deduction from net income from La. sources (4)R.S. 47:287.71 Modifications to federal gross income
(5)R.S. 47:287.73 Modifications to deductions from gross income allowed by federal law
(6)R.S. 47:287.86 Net operating loss deduction
(7)R.S. 47:287.738 Other inclusions and exclusions from gross income
(8)R.S. 47:287.745 Deductions from gross income; depletion
(9)R.S. 51:3092 Corporation income and franchise tax exemption
Present law  requires that applications for La. Quality Jobs incentives be filed no later than 24
months after the filing of the advance notification.  Further provides an exception to the application
filing requirement for projects for which an advance notification form is filed on or after July 1, 2011
and before July 1, 2012, and authorizes applications for those projects to be filed any time prior to
August 15, 2015.
Proposed law authorizes an exception to the application filing requirement for projects for which an
advance notification is filed on or after Jan. 1, 2014, and before Jan. 31, 2014, and requires
applications for those projects to be filed prior to Jan. 31, 2016.
Proposed law provides that in the event the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First
Extraordinary Session of the Legislature is enacted and becomes effective, the provisions of Sections
1, 2, and 3 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 Regular Session shall remain in effect through the termination
date in the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of the 2016 First Extraordinary Session of the
Legislature.
Effective if and when the Act that originated as House Bill No. 62 of this 2016 First Extraordinary
Session of the Legislature becomes effective.
(Amends §6 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 R.S.; Adds §7 of Act No. 126 of the 2015 R.S.)