HLS 162ES-13 REENGROSSED 2016 Second Extraordinary Session HOUSE BILL NO. 24 BY REPRESENTATIVE ANDERS TAX/INSURANCE PREMIUM: Provides relative to the insurance premium tax credit (Item #6) 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 22:832(A)(3) and to enact R.S. 22:832(C)(6), relative to the 3 insurance premium tax; to exempt health maintenance organizations from the 4 reduction of the tax due made in Act No. 10 of the 2016 First Extraordinary Session; 5 to provide for qualifying Louisiana investments of health maintenance organizations; 6 to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related matters. 7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. R.S. 22:832(A)(3) is hereby amended and reenacted and R.S. 922:832(C)(6) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 10 ยง832. Reduction of tax when certain investments are made in Louisiana 11 A. 12 * * * 13 (3) However, Paragraph (1) of this Subsection notwithstanding, for any 14 taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2016 and before January 1, 2018, for 15 all payers, except for life insurance companies writing life insurance premiums with 16 total admitted assets of fifteen million dollars or less and health maintenance 17 organizations subject to the tax in R.S. 22:842(B), the amount of the tax credit 18 granted shall not exceed ninety-five percent of the tax credit for the average 19 percentage of qualifying Louisiana investments as provided in Subsection B of this 20 Section. 21 * * * Page 1 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 162ES-13 REENGROSSED HB NO. 24 1 C. For the purposes of this Part, beginning January 1, 2017, "a qualifying 2 Louisiana investment" is hereby defined as: 3 * * * 4 (6) In addition to the investments provided for in Paragraphs (1) through (5) 5 of this Subsection, for purposes of health maintenance organizations subject to the 6 tax in R.S. 22:842(B), for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2017, and 7 before January 1, 2019, "a qualifying Louisiana investment" is hereby defined as: 8 (a) Certificates of deposit issued in Louisiana by any bank, savings and loan 9 association, or savings bank any of which has a main office or branch in Louisiana 10 or by a trust company with a main office or branch in Louisiana if such trust 11 company holds such funds in trust and invests them in certificates of deposit issued 12 by a bank, savings and loan association, or savings bank with a main office or branch 13 in Louisiana. 14 (b) Cash on deposit in an account in Louisiana in any bank, savings and loan 15 association, or savings bank, or a trust company holding such funds in trust, any of 16 which has a main office or branch in Louisiana. 17 * * * 18 Section 2. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not 19signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature 20by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana. If 21vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become 22effective on the day following such approval. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 24 Reengrossed 2016 Second Extraordinary Session Anders Abstract: Exempts health maintenance organizations from the 5% reduction to the insurance premium tax credit made in Act No. 10 of the 2016 First Extraordinary Session and provides for qualifying Louisiana investments. Page 2 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 162ES-13 REENGROSSED HB NO. 24 Present law authorizes a credit against the insurance premium tax credit for insurers who invest a portion of their total admitted assets in La. financial institutions and investment products. The amount of the credit is graduated, with the amount increasing as the percentage of an insurer's assets invested in La. increases as follows: (1)A 66% tax credit for investment of 16% of assets. (2)A 75% tax credit for investment of 20% of assets. (3)A 85% tax credit for investment of 25% of assets. (4)A 95% tax credit for investment of 33% of assets. Present law provides for a 5% reduction of the tax credit authorized in present law for any tax year beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2016, and before Jan. 1, 2018, unless the insurance company claiming the reduction writes life insurance premiums and has total admitted assets of $15 million or less. Present law defines "qualified La. investment" as: (1)Bonded debt issued with approval by the La. State Bond Commission. (2)Mortgages on property located in this state. (3)Real property located in this state. (4)Policy loans and other loans to residents and corporations domiciled in La. (5)Common or preferred stock in corporations domiciled in this state. Proposed law exempts health maintenance organizations from the 5% reduction of the tax credit. Further authorizes, for taxable years beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2017, and before Jan. 1, 2019, the following as "qualified La. investments" for health maintenance organizations: (1)Certificates of deposit issued by a La. bank or investments in such instruments by a trust company with a main office or one or more branches in La. (2)Cash on deposit in a La. bank or a trust company holding such funds in trust, operating in the state with a main office or one or more branches. Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action. (Amends R.S. 22:832(A)(3); Adds R.S. 22:832(C)(6)) Page 3 of 3 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.