Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB181 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 16RS-676	ENGROSSED
2016 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 181
BY REPRESENTATIVE BISHOP
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Department of Natural Resources
1	AN ACT
2To enact R.S. 49:191(9)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(6)(c), relative to the Department of
3 Natural Resources, including provisions to provide for the re-creation of the
4 Department of Natural Resources and the statutory entities made a part of the
5 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory
6 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related
7 matters.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Natural Resources and the
10statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,
112016, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of
12Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
13 Section 2.  All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Natural
14Resources and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section
151 of this Act shall cease as of June 30, 2021, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the
16Department of Natural Resources may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with
17the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.
18 Section 3.  The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that
19those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 16RS-676	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 181
1 Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(9)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:
2 ยง191.  Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;
3	phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates
4	Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the
5 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their
6 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority
7 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of
8 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:
9	*          *          *
10 (9)  July 1, 2020:
11	*          *          *
12	(b)  The Department of Natural Resources and all statutory entities made a
13 part of the department by law.
14 Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(6)(c) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
15 Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2016; if vetoed by the
16governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on
17June 30, 2016, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 181 Engrossed 2016 Regular Session	Bishop
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Natural Resources until June 30, 2020.
Present law requires the Dept. of Natural Resources to terminate one year from July 1, 2016,
and to begin termination on July 1, 2016, unless legislation is enacted to re-create the
department prior to that date.
Proposed law requires the Dept. of Natural Resources to terminate on July 1, 2020, and to
begin the process of terminating on July 1, 2020.  Supersedes provisions of "Sunset Law"
requiring certain procedures for re-creation and a separate bill to re-create each statutory
entity within the department.
Effective June 30, 2016.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(9)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(c))
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.