Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB273 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 273 Original	2016 Regular Session	Talbot
Abstract:  Re-creates the Dept. of Insurance for six more years. Changes termination date from July
1, 2017, to July 1, 2023.
Present law (Sunset) provides that the Dept. of Insurance and all the statutory entities made a part
of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2016, and that all
legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2017, unless the legislature enacts a bill
authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Insurance and its statutory entities,
effective June 30, 2016, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the
"sunset" law which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill
to re-create each statutory entity within the department along with additional provisions. Provides
that July 1, 2023, would be the new termination date and termination would  begin July 1, 2022,
unless the department is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2016. 
(Adds R.S. 49:191(10); Repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(g))