HLS 16RS-174 ORIGINAL 2016 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 36 BY REPRESENTATIVE CHAD BROWN APPROPRIATIONS/JUDGMENT: Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the DOTD in the matter of "Kayla Schexnayder and Emily Lagarde v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation and Development" 1 AN ACT 2To appropriate funds out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2016- 3 2017 to be used to pay the consent judgment in the suit entitled "Kayla Schexnayder 4 and Emily Lagarde v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation and 5 Development"; to provide for interest; to provide for court costs; and to provide for 6 related matters. 7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 8 Section 1. A. The sum of Seven Hundred Ten Thousand Six Hundred Ninety-Three 9and 47/100 ($710,693.47) Dollars, plus six percent (6%) interest from May 29, 2008, 10through November 13, 2013, plus judicial interest from November 14, 2013, until paid, plus 11expert fees in the amount of Eighteen Thousand One Hundred Ninety and 01/100 12($18,190.01) Dollars, in favor of plaintiff, Kayla Schexnayder, is hereby appropriated out 13of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 to be used to pay 14the amended judgment in the suit entitled "Kayla Schexnayder and Emily Lagarde v. State 15of Louisiana, Department of Transportation and Development", bearing Number 31,002 on 16the docket of the Twenty-Third Judicial District Court, parish of Assumption, state of 17Louisiana. 18 B. From the above monetary award amount payable to Kayla Schexnayder, the 19amount of Four Thousand Six Hundred Ten and 15/100 ($4,610.15) Dollars shall be paid to 20the Department of Health and Hospitals for Medicaid reimbursement in the suit entitled Page 1 of 3 HLS 16RS-174 ORIGINAL HB NO. 36 1"Kayla Schexnayder and Emily Lagarde v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation 2and Development", bearing Number 31,002 on the docket of the Twenty-Third Judicial 3District Court, parish of Assumption, state of Louisiana. 4 C. Monies awarded in this judgment to Kayla Schexnayder for future medical 5expenses shall be payable from the Future Medical Care Fund established pursuant to R.S. 639:1533.2. Payment for such future medical expenses shall be paid directly to the medical 7provider as they are incurred pursuant to R.S. 13:5106(B)(3)(c). 8 Section 2.A. The sum of Three Hundred Fifty-Seven Thousand Three Hundred 9Eleven and No/100 ($357,311.00) Dollars, plus six percent (6%) interest from May 29, 2008, 10through November 13, 2013, plus judicial interest from November 14, 2013, until paid, plus 11expert fees in the amount of Fourteen Thousand Three Hundred Fifty and 28/100 12($14,350.28) Dollars, in favor of plaintiff, Emily Lagarde, is hereby appropriated out of the 13General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 to be used to pay the 14amended judgment in the suit entitled "Kayla Schexnayder and Emily Lagarde v. State of 15Louisiana, Department of Transportation and Development", bearing Number 31,002 on the 16docket of the Twenty-Third Judicial District Court, parish of Assumption, state of Louisiana. 17 B. Monies awarded in this judgment to Emily Lagarde for future medical expenses 18shall be payable from the Future Medical Care Fund established pursuant to R.S. 39:1533.2. 19Payment for such future medical expenses shall be paid directly to the medical provider as 20they are incurred pursuant to R.S. 13:5106(B)(3)(c). 21 Section 3.A. The sum of Four Thousand Five Hundred Twenty-Five and 86/100 22($4,525.86) Dollars, in favor of the Assumption Parish Clerk of Court, is hereby 23appropriated out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 to 24be used to pay plaintiff's court costs in the suit entitled "Kayla Schexnayder and Emily 25Lagarde v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation and Development", bearing 26Number 31,002 on the docket of the Twenty-Third Judicial District Court, parish of 27Assumption, state of Louisiana. 28 B. The sum of Four Hundred Forty-Four and 86/100 ($444.86) Dollars, in favor of 29the State of Louisiana Division of Administration, Office of Risk Management is hereby 30appropriated out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 to Page 2 of 3 HLS 16RS-174 ORIGINAL HB NO. 36 1reimburse the Office of Risk Management for a portion of plaintiff's court costs previously 2advanced in this matter. 3 Section 4. The judgment provided for in Sections 1 and 2 hereof shall be deemed to 4have been paid on the effective date of this Act and legal interest shall cease to run as of that 5date. 6 Section 5. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2016; if vetoed by the governor 7and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1, 82016, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 36 Original 2016 Regular Session Chad Brown Appropriates from the state general fund for FY 16-17 the sum of $710,693.47 in favor of the plaintiff Kayla Schexnayder, less amounts due to the Department of Health and Hospitals for Medicaid reimbursement, plus the sum of $357,311 in favor of the plaintiff Emily Lagarde, plus interest and costs, to pay the amended judgment in "Kayla Schexnayder and Emily Lagarde v. State of Louisiana, Department of Transportation and Development", bearing Number 31,002 on the docket of the 23 RD JDC, parish of Assumption. Effective July 1, 2016. Page 3 of 3