Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB39 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 16RS-305	ENGROSSED
2016 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 39
BY REPRESENTATIVE PEARSON
RETIREMENT/REGISTR VOTER:  Provides relative to the maximum benefits for
members of the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System hired on or
before December 31, 2012
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 11:2072(A) and (B)(1) and to enact R.S. 11:2072(C), relative to
3 the maximum benefits for certain members of the Registrars of Voters Employees'
4 Retirement System; and to provide for related matters.
5	Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published
6	as provided by Article X, Section 29(C) of the Constitution
7	of Louisiana.
8Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
9 Section 1.  R.S. 11:2072(A) and (B)(1) are hereby amended and reenacted and R.S.
1011:2072(C) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 
11 ยง2072.  Annual amount of retirement allowance
12	A.  The annual amount of the retirement allowance for persons who retired
13 from this system on or before June 30, 1999, shall be three percent of the average
14 final compensation for each year of creditable service.
15	B.(1)  The annual amount of the retirement allowance for any person who is
16 an active contributing member of this system on and or after July 1, 1999, and whose
17 first employment making him eligible for membership in the system began prior to
18 occurred on or before January 1, 2013, and for any person who first becomes a
19 member of this system on and after July 1, 1999, but before January 1, 2013, shall
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 16RS-305	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 39
1 be equal to three and one-third percent of the average final compensation for each
2 year of creditable service.
3	*          *          *
4	C.  The retirement allowance provided to a member pursuant to the
5 provisions of this Section shall not exceed one hundred percent of the member's
6 average compensation.
7 Section 2.  This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not
8signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature
9by the governor, as provided by Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If
10vetoed by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become
11effective on the day following such approval.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 39 Engrossed 2016 Regular Session	Pearson
Abstract:  Limits to 100% of the member's average compensation the maximum amount of
benefits that may be received by a member of the Registrars of Voters Employees'
Retirement System (ROVERS) who was hired prior to Jan. 1, 2013.
Present law does not currently include an explicit cap of benefits for members hired prior
to Jan. 1, 2013.  A benefit cap of 100% of average compensation existed for such members
prior to July 1, 2012.  Proposed law reinstitutes the benefit cap of 100% of average
compensation for such members.
Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.
(Amends R.S. 11:2072(A) and (B)(1); Adds R.S. 11:2072(C))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Retirement to the
original bill:
1. Make technical changes.
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.