Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB56 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 56 Engrossed	2016 Regular Session	Leger
Abstract:  Increases the age of retirement eligibility and reduces the accrual rate for new members,
those hired on or after Jan. 1, 2017, of the Firefighters' Pension and Relief Fund in the city
of New Orleans (NOFF).
Present law provides that a member of NOFF is eligible to retire if he has 12 years of creditable
service and has attained a specified age.  For persons hired on or after Jan. 1, 1968, but prior to Jan.
1, 2015, the specified age of retirement eligibility is 50 and for persons hired on or after Jan. 1, 2015,
the specified age is 52.  Proposed law retains present law for those hired prior to Jan 1, 2017, but for
those hired on or after that date, provides that the specified age of retirement eligibility is 57.
Present law authorizes a member who has at least 12 years of creditable service, but who has not yet
attained the specified age of retirement eligibility, to leave employment and begin receiving his
benefit check upon attaining his specified retirement age.  Provides for distribution of his benefit to
his widow, children, or estate if he dies before reaching the age of retirement eligibility and to his
widow and minor children if he dies after he starts receiving a benefit.  Proposed law retains present
law except to change the age of retirement eligibility for new employees in conformity with proposed
law discussed above.
Present law provides that for a member of NOFF hired on or after Jan. 1, 2015, his retirement benefit
shall be calculated as follows: 2.75% x (5-year Final Average Compensation (FAC)) x years of
service.
Proposed law retains present law for those hired prior to Jan. 1, 2017, but for those hired on or after
that date, the benefit shall be calculated as follows: 2.5% x (5-year FAC) x years of service.
Effective August 15, 2016.
(Amends R.S. 11:3384(A)(2), (B)(2), and (D)(2) and 3386(B); Adds R.S. 11:3384(A)(3), (B)(3), and
(D)(3))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Retirement to the original bill:
1. Add an effective date.