Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB751 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 16RS-1014	REENGROSSED
2016 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 751
BY REPRESENTATIVE LEGER
MTR VEHICLE/SEAT BELTS:  Increases penalties for noncompliance with the
compulsory seat belt law
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 32:295.1(G)(1), relative to noncompliance with compulsory seat
3 belt law; to increase fines for seat belt violations; and to provide for related matters.
4Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
5 Section 1.  R.S. 32:295.1(G)(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
6 ยง295.1.  Safety belt use; tags indicating exemption
7	*          *          *
8	G.(1)  Any person who violates this Section subsequent to August 31, 1995,
9 and prior to November 1, 1995, shall be given a warning ticket only.  Subsequent to
10 October 31, 1995, any person who violates this Section shall be subject to the
11 following penalties:
12	(a)  Upon conviction of a first offense, the fine shall be twenty-five fifty
13 dollars which shall include all costs of court.
14	(b)  Upon conviction of a second offense, the fine shall be fifty seventy-five
15 dollars which shall include all costs of court.
16	(c)  Upon conviction of a third offense and any subsequent offense, the fine
17 shall be fifty seventy-five dollars plus all costs of court.
18	*          *          *
Page 1 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 16RS-1014	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 751
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 751 Reengrossed 2016 Regular Session	Leger
Abstract: Increases fines for violations of the compulsory seat belt law.
Present law provides that a person who violates present law subsequent to Aug. 31, 1995 and
prior to Nov. 1, 1995 must be issued a warning ticket only.
Proposed law removes present law.
Present law provides that any person who violates present law subsequent to Oct. 31, 1995
must be subject to certain penalties.
Proposed law retains present law but removes the reference to the expired time period
provided in present law.
Present law provides that upon conviction of a first offense, the fine shall be $25, including
all costs of court.
Proposed law increases the fine from $25 to $50.
Present law provides that upon conviction of a second offense, the fine shall be $50,
including all costs of court.
Proposed law increases the fine from $50 to $75.
Present law provides that upon conviction of a third offense and any subsequent offense, the
fine shall be $50, plus all costs of court.
Proposed law increases the fine from $50 to $75.
(Amends R.S. 32:295.1(G)(1))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
The House Floor Amendments to the engrossed bill:
1. Remove references to expired time periods provided in present law that governed
the issuance of warning tickets only, instead of fines, for violations of present
law.
Page 2 of 2
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.