Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB755 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part of the
legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law
or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 755 Original	2016 Regular Session	Abramson
Abstract:  Re-creates the Department of Revenue.
Present law (Sunset Law) provides that the Department of Revenue and all the statutory entities
made a part of that department by law shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2016, and
that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2017, unless the legislature
enacts a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Department of Revenue and its statutory
entities, effective June 30, 2016, in accordance with the "sunset law".  Proposed law supersedes the
provisions of the "sunset law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which
require a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional
provisions.  Proposed law makes July 1, 2021, the new termination date and provides that
termination will begin July 1, 2020, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2016.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(9)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(a))