Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB755 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    RÉSUMÉ DIGEST
ACT 65 (HB 755) 2016 Regular Session	Abramson
Prior law (Sunset Law) required the Dept. of Revenue (DOR) and all statutory entities made
a part of the DOR to begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2016, and that all
legislative authority for such entities ceased as of July 1, 2017, unless the legislature enacted
a bill authorizing the re-creation of the department and its statutory entities prior thereto.
New law provides for the general re-creation of the DOR and its statutory entities, effective
June 30, 2016, in accordance with the "Sunset Law".  New law supersedes the provisions of
the "Sunset Law" which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require
a separate bill to re-create each statutory entity with the department along with additional
provisions.  New law makes July 1, 2021, the new termination date and provides that
termination will begin July 1, 2020, unless the department is re-created again.
Effective June 30, 2016.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(9)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(6)(a))