HLS 16RS-1379 ORIGINAL 2016 Regular Session HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 12 BY REPRESENTATIVE CONNICK COMMENDATIONS: Commends Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., on his service to his country in the United States Army during World War II 1 A RESOLUTION 2To commend Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., on his service to his country in the United States 3 Army during World War II. 4 WHEREAS, Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., was born on January 17, 1919; he 5graduated from Warren Easton High School in New Orleans and attended Louisiana State 6University; and 7 WHEREAS, he began active duty in the United States Army on December 13, 1941; 8he graduated from Artillery School at Fort Sill in Oklahoma; and 9 WHEREAS, he honorably served as a staff officer and a field artillery battery 10commander during World War II; and 11 WHEREAS, on August 20, 1943, he departed for service in Africa; on November 25, 121943, he arrived in Naples, Italy; his tour of duty ended in Austria at the end of the war; and 13 WHEREAS, upon his return home from the war, Mr. Benezech was relieved from 14active duty at Fort Sill on April 16, 1946; he had attained the rank of captain; his service to 15the U.S. Army continued until his retirement in 1980 at the rank of lieutenant colonel; and 16 WHEREAS, Mr. Benezech has been recognized for his courageous leadership and 17has received many awards and citations for his service in the Army, including the European 18African Eastern Service Medal with five Bronze Stars and a Bronze Arrowhead, a Bronze 19Star Medal, the Croix de Guerre with one Silver Star, the American Defense Service Medal, 20the American Service Medal, and the World War II Victory Medal; and Page 1 of 2 HLS 16RS-1379 ORIGINAL HR NO. 12 1 WHEREAS, over the span of his career in the United States Army, Edward Peter 2Benezech, Jr., earned a reputation as an outstanding soldier, a superb leader, and a 3courageous warrior. 4 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the 5Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., for his 6honorable service to his country in the United States Army during World War II and does 7hereby recognize the pride and honor that this extraordinary gentleman brings to his family 8and friends and to the state of Louisiana. 9 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted 10to Edward Peter Benezech, Jr. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HR 12 Original 2016 Regular Session Connick Commends Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., on his service to his country in the U.S. Army during WWII. Page 2 of 2