Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB148 Chaptered / Bill

                    2016 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE BILL NO. 148
BY SENATOR GATTI 
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact R.S. 15:1110(B) and (C), R.S. 40:2190(B), and R.S. 48:1604(A)(2)
3 and (C) and to repeal R.S. 15:1110(D), Subpart B-1 of Part I of Chapter 1 of Title 17
4 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 17:31 through 33, R.S.
5 25:933(2) and 941, Chapter 27 of Title 25 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
6 comprised of R.S. 25:1231 through 1237, Chapter 27-A of Title 25 of the Louisiana
7 Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 25:1238.1 through 1238.7, Chapter 27-
8 D of Title 33 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S.
9 33:9039.51 through 9039.56, Chapter 16 of Title 34 of the Louisiana Revised
10 Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 34:1851 through 1857, R.S. 36:209(Q), (T), and
11 (U), 259(X), and 651(X), R.S. 40:2191, Subpart O of Part I of Chapter 1 of Subtitle
12 II of Title 47 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S.
13 47:120.38, and Chapter 21 of Title 48 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
14 comprised of R.S. 48:1811.1 through 1811.6, relative to boards, commissions,
15 authorities, districts, and like entities; to provide relative to the functional
16 organization of state government by abolishing certain boards, commissions,
17 councils, authorities, districts, and like entities; to remove references to certain
18 abolished entities; to remove references to, provisions for, and the powers, functions,
19 and duties of the Task Force on Juvenile Detention Standards and Licensing, the
20 State Advisory Commission on Teacher Education and Certification, Louisiana
21 Historic Cemetery Trust Advisory Board, Concordia Parish Port Commission,
ACT No. 614
Page 1 of 5
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 148	ENROLLED
1 Advisory Committee on Hospice Care, Northeast Louisiana Film Commission,
2 Louisiana Bicentennial Commission, Battle of New Orleans Bicentennial
3 Commission, and Interstate 10-12 Corridor District and Commission; to remove the
4 at-large member appointed by the governor to the River Parishes Transit Authority;
5 and to provide for related matters.
6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
7 Section 1. The legislature finds that abolishing, transferring, and consolidating
8 certain boards, commissions, and other statutorily-created entities is in the public interest
9 when such entities no longer serve a public purpose. It is the intent of the legislature to
10 abolish, transfer, and consolidate boards, commissions, and other statutorily-created entities
11 and make other changes as provided in this Act.
12 Task Force on Juvenile Detention Standards and Licensing
13 Section 2.(A) R.S. 15:1110(B) and (C) are hereby amended and reenacted to read as
14 follows:
15 §1110. Detention standards; licensing; fees
16	*          *          *
17	B. On or before July 1, 2011, the Louisiana Juvenile Detention Association
18 shall develop and recommend uniform standards for local juvenile detention
19 facilities that comport with nationally recognized and accepted best practice
20 standards for juvenile detention facilities. In developing these standards, the
21 Louisiana Juvenile Detention Association shall seek input and guidance from the
22 Task Force on Juvenile Detention Standards and Licensing provided for in
23 Subsection D of this Section.
24	C. On or before January 1, 2012, the Department of Children and Family
25 Services shall develop and promulgate, in accordance with the provisions of the
26 Administrative Procedure Act, rules governing the licensing of juvenile detention
27 facilities consistent with the standards recommended by the Louisiana Juvenile
28 Detention Association. In developing these rules, the department shall seek input and
29 guidance from the Task Force on Juvenile Detention Standards and Licensing
30 provided for in Subsection D of this Section.
Page 2 of 5
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 148	ENROLLED
1	*          *          *
2	(B) R.S. 15:1110(D) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
3 River Parishes Transit Authority
4 Section 3. R.S. 48:1604(A)(2) and (C) are hereby amended and reenacted to read as
5 follows:
6 §1604. Board of commissioners; membership, terms, vacancies
7	A.(1) *          *          *
8	(2) Each commissioner must be domiciled within the parish from which he
9 is appointed, except for the one at-large member appointed by the governor and the
10 one at-large member representing the workforce development board, who must be
11 domiciled within the state.
12	*          *          *
13	C. All initial terms shall begin September 15, 1999. After the initial terms
14 have expired, appointments shall be concurrent with the terms of the appointing
15 authority, except that a vacancy shall be filled for the unexpired portion of the term
16 by the authority which made the original appointment. The at-large member
17 appointed by the governor shall serve at his pleasure. A member of the authority may
18 be appointed by the appropriate authority to succeed himself.
19	*          *          * 
20 State Advisory Commission on Teacher Education and Certification
21 Section 4.(A) Subpart B-1 of Part I of Chapter 1 of Title 17 of the Louisiana Revised
22 Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 17:31 through 33, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
23 (B) R.S. 36:651(X) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
24 Louisiana Historic Cemetery Trust Advisory Board
25 Section 5.(A) R.S. 25:933(2) and 941 are hereby repealed in their entirety.
26 (B) R.S. 36:209(T) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
27 Northeast Louisiana Film Commission
28 Section 6. Chapter 27-D of Title 33 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
29 comprised of R.S. 33:9039.51 through 9039.56, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
30 Concordia Parish Port Commission
Page 3 of 5
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 148	ENROLLED
1 Section 7. Chapter 16 of Title 34 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
2 comprised of R.S. 34:1851 through 1857, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
3 Advisory Committee on Hospice Care
4 Section 8.(A) R.S. 40:2190(B) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows:
5	§2190. Time for making license application
6	*          *          *
7	B. The governor shall appoint the initial members of the Advisory Committee
8 on Hospice Care not later than September 1, 1988. The department shall develop
9 appropriate rules and regulations necessary for the administration of this Part, and
10 shall cause the publication in the Louisiana Register of the same not later than
11 February 20, 1989.
12	*          *          *
13 (B) R.S. 36:259(X) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
14 (C) R.S. 40:2191 is hereby repealed in its entirety.
15 Interstate 10-12 Corridor District and Commission
16 Section 9. Chapter 21 of Title 48 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
17 comprised of R.S. 48:1811.1 through 1811.6, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
18 Louisiana Bicentennial Commission
19 Section 10.(A) Chapter 27 of Title 25 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
20 comprised of R.S. 25:1231 through 1237, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
21 (B) R.S. 36:209(Q) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
22 (C) Subpart O of Part I of Chapter 1 of Subtitle II of Title 47 of the Louisiana
23 Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 47:120.38, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
24 Battle of New Orleans Bicentennial Commission
25 Section 11.(A) Chapter 27-A of Title 25 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950,
26 comprised of R.S. 25:1238.1 through 1238.7, is hereby repealed in its entirety.
27 (B) R.S. 36:209(U) is hereby repealed in its entirety.
28 Section 12. The property and funds, if any, of the entities abolished by this Act
29 whose functions are not transferred to another entity or official shall be the property of the
30 state and the state treasurer shall provide for the deposit of such funds in the state treasury
Page 4 of 5
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 148	ENROLLED
1 to the credit of the state general fund, after deposit in the Bond Security and Redemption
2 Fund as otherwise provided by law.
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:                          
Page 5 of 5
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.