Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB303 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Cheryl M. Serrett. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Ashley
Menou.
DIGEST
SB 303 Engrossed	2016 Regular Session	Morrell
Present law provides DPSC sole authority over the placement, care, treatment, or other
considerations necessary for children judicially committed to DPSC.
Proposed law clarifies that the authority is with the office of juvenile justice within DPSC and makes
an exception for educational services as provided in proposed law.
Proposed law adds "office of juvenile justice schools" to the state and district accountability program
and all programs providing educational services to students in secure care of DPSC.
Proposed law requires, not later than July 1, 2016, BESE to convene a mutual accountability team
to draft and propose to BESE a specialized accountability program for office of juvenile justice
schools. 
Proposed law requires the mutual accountability team to have recommendations on the
accountability program to BESE no later than March 1, 2017.
Proposed law provides the membership of the mutual accountability shall consist of:
(1)One member of the School and District Accountability Commission 
(2)One person designated by the deputy secretary of the office of juvenile justice.
(3)One person who is an expert on education in custodial settings, designated by the chairperson
of the Juvenile Justice Reform Act Implementation Commission, after consultation with the
Council of State Governments.
(4)One person representing the interests of students and families, designated by the executive
director of the Louisiana Advocacy Center.
(5)One person who is an expert in alternative education in community settings, designated by
the director of the Institute for Public Health and Justice at Louisiana State University.
Proposed law requires BESE to adopt rules establishing a specialized accountability program to
office of juvenile justice schools no later than March 1, 2017. The specialized accountability
program must include:
(1)A specialized school report card for office of juvenile justice schools. (2)A program of regular, in-person monitoring of office of juvenile justice schools on no less
than an annual basis.
(3)A set of supports, interventions, and remedies for implementation when an office of juvenile
justice school is deemed academically unacceptable.
Proposed law requires the state DOE assemble and calculate office of juvenile justice school report
cards annually and publish report cards and performance scores on their website. 
Proposed law requires the office of juvenile justice to publish report cards and performance scores
of office of juvenile justice schools on their website.
Proposed law requires the mutual accountability team to recommend to BESE a policy governing
educational assessment and counseling of students in office of juvenile justice schools no later than
January 1, 2017.
Proposed law requires, no later than July 1, 2017, the mutual accountability team recommend to
BESE a policy mandating which records, information, or other documentation must be maintained.
Proposed law further provides that BESE consider the mutual accountability team's
recommendations when adopting rules and regulations.
Proposed law provides that no later than December 1, 2016, the mutual accountability team shall
recommend selection criteria for a comprehensive computerized student information system to be
used by office of juvenile justice schools.
Proposed law requires the state superintendent of education designate a program manager for
juvenile justice education programs no later than January 1, 2017.
Proposed law provides that the office of juvenile justice shall be considered a parish school board
for purposes of development and submission of pupil progression plans.
Proposed law provides that MFP funds and other federal funds for youth in office of juvenile justice
facilities be subject to the same oversight and accountability as other school boards.
Proposed law provides that office of juvenile justice schools are subject to same data collection
provisions as city and parish school boards. 
Effective August 1, 2016.
(Amends Ch.C.Art. 908(A), R.S. 15:905(A), (B), and (C), 17:3911(B)(1) and (3) and (C)(2), and
3912 (A); adds R.S. 17:10.9 and 100.1(D)) 
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Judiciary B to the original bill 1. Technical amendments to language.
2. Changes the membership of the mutual accountability team.
3. Changes the contents of the specialized accountability program.
4. Changes certain mandatory provisions to recommendations.
5. Changes in requirements to the development of a school monitoring program for
office of juvenile justice schools.
6. Removes provisions for failure to receive or maintain accreditation by any office of
juvenile justice school.
7. Changes the start date for publication of specialized office of juvenile justice school
report cards and performance scores.
8. Changes deadline for recommendations sent by the mutual accountability team to
BESE for a policy governing education assessment of student in office of juvenile
justice schools.
9. Changes due date and criteria to be considered by the mutual accountability team
when making its recommendations for a computerized student information system.
10.Removes provisions granting a cause of action to enjoin DOE or DPSC for failure
to comply with applicable provisions.