Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SCR3 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    The original instrument was prepared by Christine Arbo Peck. The following digest,
which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by
Tammy Crain-Waldrop.
DIGEST
SCR 3 Engrossed	2016 Regular Session	Mills
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to submit a report by October 1, 2016, on the
health benefits and healthcare costs associated with adding ALD to the newborn screening panel. The
healthcare costs reported on shall include costs to the state lab operated through the Office of Public
Health and also include a detailed financial analysis of how those costs would be reimbursed by
Medicaid and to the extent determinable, by commercial insurance.
Requests that DHH add ALD to the newborn screening panel no later than January 1, 2017.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill
1. Adds that healthcare costs reported include costs to the state lab operated through the
Office of Public Health and also include a detailed financial analysis of how those
costs would be reimbursed by Medicaid and to the extent determinable, by
commercial insurance.
2. Changes the resolution to an "urge and request".
3. Changes the date the report is due from May 1, 2016, to October 1, 2016.
4. Changes the date requesting the addition of ALD to the panel from Jan. 1, 2017, to
August 1, 2017.