Louisiana 2016 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR78 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 16RS-1671	ORIGINAL
2016 Regular Session
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 78
BY SENATOR BISHOP 
COMMENDATIONS.  Commends Rev. Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the 40th anniversary of
his ordination.
1	A RESOLUTION
2 To commend Reverend Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the fortieth anniversary of his ordination.
3 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was born in Bolden, Louisiana on May 8, 1945; and
4 WHEREAS, he is a graduate of Southern University in Baton Rouge; and
5 WHEREAS, his first profession of vows took place on August 12, 1971, and his final
6 profession occurred on February 22, 1975; and
7 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus became a diaconate on April 5, 1975, and was
8 ordained on May 8, 1976; and
9 WHEREAS, he entered the Deacon Internship Program on June 14, 1975, and was
10 assigned to Our Lady of Perpetual Help Catholic Church in Washington, DC, and also
11 served as an associate pastor from October 1, 1978, to December 1978; and
12 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was an associate pastor at the Church of the Epiphany
13 in New Orleans from October 1, 1976, to September 1978, at St. Francis Xavier Catholic
14 Church in Houston, Texas, from December 10, 1978, to August 1982, and at St. Peter Claver
15 Catholic Church in New Orleans from September 1, 1982, to September 1983, where he also
16 served as the spiritual director of the House of Studies; and
17 WHEREAS, he returned to Houston in 1983 and served as the pastor of St. Francis
18 Xavier Catholic Church from October 1, 1983, to September 1987, was elected Consultor
Page 1 of 3 SR NO. 78
SLS 16RS-1671	ORIGINAL
1 General in June 1987, and served as Consultor General at The Josephite Generalate in
2 Baltimore, Maryland from October 3, 1987, to September 1991; and
3 WHEREAS, from October 1, 1991, to September 1994, Reverend Andrus served as
4 the pastor at St. Therese of Lisieux Catholic Church in Gulfport, Mississippi, and at St.
5 Brigid Catholic Church in Los Angeles, California, from October 1, 1994, to September 22,
6 2000; and
7 WHEREAS, he served as the director of the Office of African American Ministry
8 and the African American Catholic Evangelization Center in Los Angeles from October 1,
9 2000, to October 18, 2002; and
10 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus served as swingman at St. Theresa Catholic Church
11 in Crowley, Louisiana, from December 15, 2002, to September 2003, and was the administer
12 pro tempore at Our Lady Star of the Sea Catholic Church in Houston from March 20, 2003,
13 to September 4, 2003; and
14 WHEREAS, he served as pastor in an area ministry of Our Mother of Mercy Catholic
15 Church and Our Lady Star of the Sea Catholic Church in Houston from September 5, 2003,
16 to October 2005, and was the vicar for African American Catholics for the Archdiocese of
17 Galveston-Houston from January 1, 2005, to October 2005; and
18 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was the parochial vicar at St. Francis Xavier in Baton
19 Rouge and a member of the SSJ Hurricane Relief Team from January 1, 2006, to August
20 2006, and served as the parochial vicar at Corpus Christi-Epiphany Catholic Church in New
21 Orleans from August 11, 2006, to August 12, 2009; and
22 WHEREAS, he was elected as Area II Director from October 1, 2007, to June 13,
23 2011, and was reelected to that position and served in that capacity from June 14, 2011, to
24 June 2015; and
25 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus was interim president of St. Augustine High School
26 in New Orleans from August 2009 to June 8, 2011, and has been serving as the pastor of
27 Blessed Sacrament-St. Joan of Arc Catholic Church in New Orleans since August 13, 2009;
28 and
29 WHEREAS, in addition to his pastoral duties, Reverend Andrus spends his weekends
30 in LaBeau, Louisiana, caring for his mother who is one hundred two years of age; and
Page 2 of 3 SR NO. 78
SLS 16RS-1671	ORIGINAL
1 WHEREAS, his interests include Zydeco music, eating crawfish, horses, and
2 football; and
3 WHEREAS, Reverend Andrus is a dedicated servant having devoted his life to
4 serving God's people, is an inspiration to the numerous parishioners he has served, and
5 merits a special measure of commendation; and
6 WHEREAS, upon the celebration of Reverend Andrus' fortieth anniversary of
7 ordination, it is appropriate to recognize his honorable leadership in the Catholic church. 
8 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana
9 does hereby commend Reverend Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the celebration of his fortieth
10 anniversary of ordination to the priesthood, does hereby recognize his noble achievements
11 and contributions in his priestly ministry, and does hereby wish him full measures of success
12 and happiness in the future.
13 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to
14 Reverend Charles Andrus.
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Nancy Vicknair.
DIGEST
SR 78 Original	2016 Regular Session	Bishop
Commends Rev. Charles Andrus, S.S.J. on the 40th anniversary of his ordination.
Page 3 of 3