Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House of Representatives 2016 Bills & Legislation

LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR99

Introduced
5/2/16  
Introduced
5/2/16  
Engrossed
5/2/16  
Passed
5/4/16  
Designates Tuesday, May 3, 2016, as Susan G. Komen Day at the legislature and commends Susan G. Komen and its La. affiliates
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR1

Introduced
3/14/16  
Introduced
3/14/16  
Passed
3/15/16  
Commends Sully Laiche, Al'Dontre Davis, and Ben St. Pierre for their performance and selection to the Louisiana Sports Writers Association's Class 3A all-state football team
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR10

Introduced
3/15/16  
Introduced
3/15/16  
Commends the La. Physical Therapy Association and designates March 14 through March 18, 2016, as Louisiana Physical Therapy Association Week
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR100

Introduced
4/26/16  
Introduced
4/26/16  
Passed
4/27/16  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Dick Walther, D.V.M., of Houma
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR101

Introduced
4/26/16  
Passed
4/27/16  
Commends Jacqueline Marie Richard Johnson upon the celebration of her sixty-seventh birthday
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR102

Introduced
4/26/16  
Introduced
4/26/16  
Passed
4/28/16  
Designates Thursday, April 28, 2016, as Louisiana Community and Technical College System Workforce Experience and Taste of Louisiana Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR103

Introduced
4/27/16  
Introduced
4/27/16  
Passed
4/28/16  
Designates Wednesday, April 27, 2016, as Krabbe Disease Awareness Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR104

Introduced
4/27/16  
Introduced
4/27/16  
Passed
4/28/16  
Commends Frank and Margie Coliston upon the celebration of their sixty-fifth wedding anniversary
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR105

Introduced
4/27/16  
Introduced
4/27/16  
Passed
4/28/16  
Commends Jesuit High School upon winning the 2016 Louisiana High School Lacrosse League championship
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR106

Introduced
4/27/16  
Introduced
4/27/16  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Jerry Barksdale Byrd, Sr.
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR107

Introduced
5/2/16  
Introduced
5/2/16  
Refer
5/3/16  
Urges and requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to study Medicaid reimbursement and recoupment processes with respect to payments to nonemergency medical transportation providers
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR108

Introduced
5/2/16  
Introduced
5/2/16  
Passed
5/3/16  
Recognizes the common interests and experiences of The Netherlands and Louisiana and welcomes Jeanne Jenniskens Van Maarseveen and Nicole Jenniskens to the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR109

Introduced
5/2/16  
Introduced
5/2/16  
Recognizes May 1 through 7, 2016, as National Correctional Employees Week and commends the efforts of the employees of the office of juvenile justice
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR11

Introduced
3/16/16  
Introduced
3/16/16  
Refer
3/17/16  
Refer
3/17/16  
Report Pass
5/24/16  
Provides relative to the passage of the Capital Outlay Bill
LA

Louisiana 2016 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HR110

Introduced
5/2/16  
Passed
5/3/16  
Designates May 15 through May 21, 2016, as Police Week in the state of Louisiana and commends the service of law enforcement officers

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records