HLS 171ES-34 ENGROSSED 2017 First Extraordinary Session HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 2 BY REPRESENTATIVES MCFARLAND AND ABRAHAM FUNDS/FUNDING: Provides for monies in the Budget Stabilization Fund to be available for appropriation in Fiscal Year 2016-2017 (Item #4) 1 A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION 2To make available for appropriation from the Budget Stabilization Fund the sum of 3 $74,645,508, due to the reduction of the Fiscal Year 2016-2017 official forecast in 4 the amount of $340.5 Million as adopted by the Revenue Estimating Conference at 5 its meeting on January 13, 2017, resulting in the second mid-year deficit for the 6 current fiscal year, and presented to and recognized by the Joint Legislative 7 Committee on the Budget at its meeting on January 27, 2017. 8 WHEREAS, during the current fiscal year, it was determined that the state of 9Louisiana ended Fiscal Year 2015-2016 with a deficit of $313.8 Million (Fiscal Year 2016 10Deficit); and 11 WHEREAS, Article VII, Section 10(G) of the Constitution of Louisiana provides that 12if a deficit exists in any fund at the end of a fiscal year, that deficit shall be eliminated no 13later than the end of the next fiscal year; and 14 WHEREAS, the governor presented a deficit reduction plan to the Joint Legislative 15Committee on the Budget on December 15, 2016, that addressed and eliminated the Fiscal 16Year 2016 Deficit of $313.8 Million through a combination of budget reductions contained 17in Executive Order JBE 16-74 and adjustments approved by the Joint Legislative Committee 18on the Budget; and 19 WHEREAS, additionally, during the current Fiscal Year 2016-2017, the state of 20Louisiana has experienced a severe financial crisis due to many factors, including declining 21revenues attributable to decreased collections of corporate income and franchise tax, Page 1 of 4 HLS 171ES-34 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 2 1individual income tax, and sales and use tax, causing corresponding decreases in the amount 2of $340.5 Million in the official forecast of the Revenue Estimating Conference for Fiscal 3Year 2016-2017; and 4 WHEREAS, Article VII, Section 10.3 of the Constitution of Louisiana establishes 5the Budget Stabilization Fund in the state treasury and in Subparagraph (C)(2) thereof 6provides that if a deficit for the current fiscal year is projected due to a decrease in the 7official forecast, an amount equal to one-third of the fund not to exceed the projected deficit 8may be appropriated after the consent of two-thirds of the elected members of each house 9of the legislature; and 10 WHEREAS, R.S. 39:95 provides that the state treasurer shall report the balance of 11the Budget Stabilization Fund as of July first of each fiscal year to the Revenue Estimating 12Conference, which shall certify the Budget Stabilization Fund balance and the determination 13of one-third of the balance; and 14 WHEREAS, the balance in the Budget Stabilization Fund as of July 1, 2016, was 15$358,982,171, and one-third of such balance as certified by the Revenue Estimating 16Conference is $119,660,723, which is the maximum amount of the Budget Stabilization 17Fund available for appropriation for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 to address a projected deficit; 18and 19 WHEREAS, subsequent to obtaining the consent of two-thirds of the elected 20members of each house of the legislature for the use of $74,645,508 from the Budget 21Stabilization Fund, the legislature shall appropriate such amount for use in Fiscal Year 222016-2017; and 23 WHEREAS, in addition to the decline in the official forecast, due to the state of 24emergency caused by heavy rain and flooding, the state has also experienced expenditure 25shortfalls in the current fiscal year which total over $30 Million; and 26 WHEREAS, the state has further identified additional shortfalls in the current fiscal 27year that total at least $35 Million and are attributable to Local Housing of Adult Offenders 28and the Department of Corrections; and 29 WHEREAS, prior to recognizing the reduction of the Fiscal Year 2016-2017 official 30forecast in the amount of $340.5 Million, hundreds of millions of dollars in reductions and Page 2 of 4 HLS 171ES-34 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 2 1adjustments were made to agencies and departments in state government; and due to the state 2of emergency caused by rains and flooding, certain state departments are waiting on federal 3reimbursement of approximately $246 Million in disaster expenditures which has caused 4budgetary and cash flow problems for those agencies and departments; and in the last four 5months of the fiscal year, the options to eliminate the budget deficit are significantly 6reduced, thereby leading to the request to use $74,645,508 from the Budget Stabilization 7Fund towards elimination of the second mid-year deficit for the current fiscal year, which 8is a purpose for which the Budget Stabilization Fund is intended; and 9 WHEREAS, after incorporating debt service savings and means of financing options, 10the current deficit for Fiscal Year 2016-2017 is $304.22 Million, without inclusion of the 11aforementioned shortfalls of at least $65 Million. 12 THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that pursuant to Article VII, Section 10.3 of the 13Constitution of Louisiana and R.S. 39:94, the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby consent 14to make available for appropriation from the Budget Stabilization Fund the sum of 15$74,645,508 of the balance of the Budget Stabilization Fund as of July 1, 2016, due to the 16reduction of the revenue forecast for the current fiscal year as adopted by the Revenue 17Estimating Conference at its meeting on January 13, 2017, and utilizing means of financing 18adjustments reduced that amount to $304.22 Million, which was recognized by the Joint 19Legislative Committee on the Budget at its meeting on January 27, 2017. 20 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the treasurer is directed, after complying with 21the provisions of Article VII , Section 9(B) of the Constitution of Louisiana relative to the 22allocation of monies to the Bond Security and Redemption Fund, to take the appropriate 23steps to transfer $74,645,508 from the Budget Stabilization Fund to the state general fund. 24 BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a copy of this Resolution be transmitted to the 25treasurer. Page 3 of 4 HLS 171ES-34 ENGROSSED HCR NO. 2 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HCR 2 Engrossed 2017 First Extraordinary Session McFarland Provides legislative consent to make available for appropriation from the Budget Stabilization Fund the sum of $74,645,508, due to the reduction of the Fiscal Year 2016- 2017 official forecast in the amount of $340.5 Million as adopted by the Revenue Estimating Conference at its meeting on Jan. 13, 2017, resulting in the second mid-year deficit for the current fiscal year, and presented to and recognized by the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget at its meeting on Jan. 27, 2017. Summary of Amendments Adopted by House The Committee Amendments Proposed by House Committee on Appropriations to the original bill: 1. Changes the amount available from appropriation from the Budget Stabilization Fund from $50,000,000 to $74,645,508. Page 4 of 4