DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 277 Original 2017 Regular Session James Abstract: Requires certain mandatory basic and annual certification hours for peace officers and establishes the time periods for all peace officers to obtain P.O.S.T. training and certification. Present law establishes the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training and authorizes the council to develop curriculum requirements for training of peace officers and to accredit law enforcement training centers. Present law further provides for the training requirements for peace officers. Proposed law requires all peace officers to successfully complete a minimum of 400 hours of basic core curriculum training and a minimum of 20 hours of in service training on an annual basis to maintain P.O.S.T. certification, to be prescribed by the council. Proposed law requires the council to develop and implement curriculum for de-escalation, bias policing recognition, sudden in-custody death, and crisis intervention training for peace officers no later than Jan. 1, 2018. Present law requires all peace officers to be certified by the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training by completing a certified training program prescribed by the council and to successfully pass a council approved comprehensive examination within one calendar year from the date of initial employment. Proposed law retains present law but requires part-time or reserve peace officers hired after Jan. 1, 2020, to successfully complete a certified training program approved by the council and successfully pass a council-approved comprehensive examination within one calendar year from initial date of employment. Present law also requires peace officers hired after Jan. 1, 1986, in a village with a population of less than 1,000 to obtain P.O.S.T. certification within 2 calendar years and exempts part-time and reserve peace officers from this requirement. Proposed law retains present law but requires part-time or reserve peace officers hired after Jan. 1, 2022, to successfully complete a certified training program approved by the council and to successfully pass a council-approved comprehensive examination within one calendar year from initial date of employment. Present law further provides that any person who fails to comply with training requirements shall not be prohibited from performing administrative duties. Present law requires the Council on Peace Officer Standards and Training to develop and implement by Aug. 1, 2006, a training course on law enforcement interaction with mentally ill or developmentally disabled persons with assistance from community, local, and state organizations specialized in the area of working with such population. Present law further provides that the training course on law enforcement interaction with mentally ill and developmentally disabled persons will be implemented when funding is made available for such program. Proposed law retains present law but removes the funding contingency language provided in present law. (Amends R.S. 40:2405(A)(2), (E), (H)(2)(a), and (I)(2); Adds R.S. 40:2404.2; Repeals R.S. 40:2405.5(F))