RÉSUMÉ DIGEST ACT 372 (HB 450) 2017 Regular Session Abramson Existing law creates the Upper Audubon Security District in Orleans Parish as a political subdivision to aid in crime prevention and reduction by providing additional security for district residents. Existing law provides that the district is managed by a seven-member board of commissioners. Prior law provided that the president of the Upper Audubon Association (association) served as a member of the board. New law provides that the president of the association serves as a member of the board but authorizes the president to designate a person to serve in his stead. Existing law authorizes the governing authority of the city of New Orleans to impose a parcel fee on behalf of the district, subject to voter approval. Prior law provided that the fee was not to exceed $500 per year for each parcel. New law authorizes an increase in the maximum parcel fee to $700 per year beginning Jan. 1, 2019. Authorizes the district to call an election for the purpose of submitting the question of increasing the maximum parcel fee to the district's voters. New law authorizes the district's board to change the amount of the fee by duly adopted resolution, not to exceed the maximum amount authorized by new law and approved by the voters. Prior law provided that the fee expired at the time provided in the proposition authorizing the fee, not to exceed six years from its initial imposition. New law instead provides for a seven-year limit on the duration of the fee. Provides, however, that the if the voters authorize an increase in the maximum fee in excess of $500 prior to Jan. 1, 2026, then the parcel fee shall expire on Dec. 31, 2026. Existing law authorizes renewal of the fee, subject to voter approval. Prior law required the election for renewal of the fee to be held only at the same time as the mayoral primary election for the city of New Orleans. New law requires that the election for renewal be held at any regularly scheduled election in New Orleans. Prior law provided that if renewed, the term of the imposition of the fee was as provided in the proposition authorizing the renewal, not to exceed eight years. New law instead provides for a seven-year limit on the duration of the renewal. Effective in part upon signature of governor (June 23, 2017). Effective in part on January 1, 2019. (Amends R.S. 33:9091.12(D)(1)(a) and (F)(2) and (4))